CRITTENDEN v. MITCHEFF
Plaintiff: LAMARR T. CRITTENDEN
Defendant: MICHAEL MITCHEFF
Case Number: 1:2020cv02159
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet, filed by Lamar Crittenden. Copy/Copies provided via US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Public Docket Sheet) (AAS)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The plaintiff shall have throughNovember 2, 2020, to pay the initial partial filing fee or explain why doing so is not possible. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/6/2020.(JRB)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LAMARR T. CRITTENDEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Sixteen Dollars and Six Cents ($16.06). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through September 25, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/26/2020. (JRB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LAMARR T. CRITTENDEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IDOC All transaction History Report, #2 Envelope). (AKH) Modified on 8/26/2020 (AKH). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/26/2020) (AKH).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL MITCHEFF, filed by LAMARR T. CRITTENDEN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Addendum to Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRITTENDEN v. MITCHEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAMARR T. CRITTENDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MITCHEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?