NORRIS et al v. PLUMMER LONG et al
Plaintiff: JUSTIN NORRIS
Defendant: WEXFORD OF INDIANA, RANDOLPH, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CLEMEMS and CHASITY PLUMMER LONG
Case Number: 1:2020cv02168
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Motion to Proceed In Forma PauperisThe plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #6 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Seventeen Dollars and Eleven Cents ($17.11). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through October 28, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/30/2020. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JUSTIN NORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Offender Trust Transaction History, #2 Envelope)(DWH)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JUSTIN NORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through September 22, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). Copies to plaintiff by US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP) (MEH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLEMEMS, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CHASITY PLUMMER LONG, RANDOLPH, WEXFORD OF INDIANA, filed by JUSTIN NORRIS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORRIS et al v. PLUMMER LONG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEMEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASITY PLUMMER LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN NORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?