MERCADO v. MADDIX et al
Plaintiff: ANGELITO C. MERCADO
Defendant: KYLE YOUNG, PRANTHER, BRANDON DECKER, ROBERT MITCHELL, SCHRADER and DRAKE MADDIX
Case Number: 1:2020cv02179
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1986
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff ANGELITO C. MERCADO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Envelope)(DWH)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 RECEIPT #IP070905 for civil filing fee in the amount of $400.00, paid by plaintiff. (AKH)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY DISCUSSING FILING FEE: Plaintiff, Angelito Mercado has not paid the $400 filing fee prescribed by Congress. See 28 U.S.C. 1914(a). He also appears to have "struck out" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Mr. Mercado shall have through October 12, 2020 to pay the $400 filing fee to the clerk of the district court. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice (SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/14/2020. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ANGELITO C. MERCADO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Submission of Letter re: Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiff ANGELITO C. MERCADO. (AKH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Envelope) (DJH).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRANDON DECKER, DRAKE MADDIX, ROBERT MITCHELL, PRANTHER, SCHRADER, KYLE YOUNG, filed by ANGELITO C. MERCADO. (No fee paid with this filing). (AKH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Envelope) (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCADO v. MADDIX et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRANTHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAKE MADDIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELITO C. MERCADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?