STONE-DUNLAP v. WARDEN
Plaintiff: ERIC STONE-DUNLAP
Defendant: WARDEN
Case Number: 1:2020cv02180
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Faye Weiss on behalf of Defendant WARDEN. (Weiss, Natalie)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 10/26/2020. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/14/2020.(AAS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00392. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/19/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 8/19/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER STRIKING 16 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in 3:20-cv-57, by Eric Stone-Dunlap; DIRECTING the clerk to open a new case using the habeas petition 16 ; and DIRECTING the clerk to apply the paid filing fee in that new case. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/15/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 8/19/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00, receipt #3024664), filed by Eric Stone-Dunlap. (Docketed per #2 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STONE-DUNLAP v. WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC STONE-DUNLAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?