FITZMARK, INC. v. CAMPBELL et al
Plaintiff: INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC and FITZMARK, INC.
Defendant: RYAN CAMPBELL
Case Number: 1:2020cv02183
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell, #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Againt Ryan Campbell , filed by Defendants RYAN CAMPBELL, INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (Jones, Terrance)
October 14, 2020 Filing 65 ENTRY RESETTING HEARING - The October 21, 2020 motions hearing is VACATED and RESET for November 6, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. telephonically. The call-in information will be set by separate entry. The hearing may be vacated if the Court finds the parties' briefs adequately address the issues. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/14/2020.(JDH)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Unscheduled Status Conference held on 10/8/2020. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #62 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The briefing schedule for the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #7 ) shall be amended as follows: Defendants' Response shall be filed by October 14, 2020. Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed by October 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
October 8, 2020 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to October 16, 2020 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell, #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell MOTION for Temporary Restraining Orde MOTION for Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Orlowski, Alexander)
October 7, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to October 16, 2020 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell, #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Againt Ryan Campbell , MOTION for Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (), filed by Defendants RYAN CAMPBELL, INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Terrance)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Settlement Conference held on 10/6/2020. The parties were present and represented by counsel. The parties conducted settlement negotiations. No further orders are entered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Maintain Document Under Seal #20 Marion County Court Record. The Court shall maintain the Marion County Court Record Docket No. #20 under seal. A redacted, public version of the Marion County Court Record can be found at Docket No. #56 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/6/2020. (AAS)
September 28, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Infinity's Amended Notice of Removal, re #31 Notice (Other), filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Seal Document #20 Remark Marion County Court Record, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 56 REDACTION to #20 Remark Marion County Court Record by FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Discovery Conference held on 9/23/2020. Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset September 24, 2020 Settlement Conference (Docket No. #42 ) is GRANTED. The SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for September 24, 2020 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to OCTOBER 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. Clients with full settlement authority are to be present at this conference. (See attachment for particulars, including description of which client(s) must attend.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) Modified to correct document link on 9/24/2020 (TMB). (Main Document 55 replaced on 9/24/2020) (TMB).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Maintain Document #47 Under Seal - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/22/2020. (JRB)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Amend and Supplement Magistrate Judge's Order on Telephonic Status Conference - Plaintiff's deadline to file its reply brief in support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction is HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING October 14, 2020. A TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE is set for SEPTEMBER 23, 2020 at 10:30 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/22/2020.(AAS)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MAINTAIN DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #27 Plaintiff having filed its Motion to Maintain Documents Under Seal Docket No. #27 , and the Court having considered the Motion, now finds that it should be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED WITH LEAVE TO REFILE IN PART.the Court shall maintain Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Docket No. #25 under seal. A redacted public version of this document may be found at Docket No. #26 . Plaintiff's request to seal Docket No. #20 is DENIED WITH LEAVE TO REFILE. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-11(g), the Clerk is DIRECTED to unseal the Marion County Court Record Docket No. #20 twenty-one (21) days after this Entry, unless a renewed motion is filed to maintain the document under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/21/2020. (AAS)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Maintain Document Under Seal #8 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #11 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/18/2020. (JRB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #48 Redacted Document, #47 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 48 REDACTION to #47 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Tender of Supplemental Exhibit in Support of TRO by FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Redacted Supplemental))(Barr, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 47 SEALED Supplemental Exhibit, re #22 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionMotion for TRO, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Supplemental))(Barr, Matthew)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/14/2020.(JRB)
September 11, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Amend and Supplement #36 Magistrate Judge's Order on Telephonic Status Conference, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PI Interrogatories to Campbell, #2 Exhibit B - PI Doc Requests to Campbell, #3 Exhibit C - PI Doc Requests to Infinity, #4 Exhibit D - Jurisdictional Interrogatories to Campbell, #5 Exhibit E - Jurisdictional Doc Requests to Campbel, #6 Exhibit F - Jurisdictional Interrogatories to Infinity, #7 Exhibit G - Jurisdictional Doc Requests to Infinity, #8 Exhibit H - Correspondence with Counsel, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
September 11, 2020 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated), filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
September 10, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION to Vacate and Reset September 24, 2020, Settlement Conference Consent of Defendants, filed by Defendants RYAN CAMPBELL, INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (Jones, Terrance)
September 10, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Vacate and Reset September 24, 2020, Settlement Conference, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence with Opposing Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
September 4, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Protective Order , or, in the Alternative, to Extend Time for Responses to Discovery, #19 MOTION for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, to Extend Time for Responses to Discovery , filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
September 4, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Againt Ryan Campbell , filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of JD Davis)(Barr, Matthew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) and Response to #9 Motion to Transfer Venue, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of JD Davis, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jurisdictional Interrogatories to Infinity, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jurisdictional Interrogatories to Campbell, #4 Exhibit 4 - Jurisdictional RPD to Infinity, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jurisdictional RPD to Campbell, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Againt Ryan Campbell , filed by Defendants RYAN CAMPBELL, INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Ryan Campbell)(Jones, Terrance)
September 2, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Buddy B. Presley, Jr on behalf of Defendants RYAN CAMPBELL, INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (Presley, Buddy)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 8/27/2020. The remaining briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Against Ryan Campbell (Docket No. #22 ) shall be as follows: A. Defendants' Response shall be filed by September 2, 2020. B. Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed by September 4, 2020. The remaining briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #7 ) shall be as follows: A. Defendants' Response shall be filed by October 9, 2020. B. Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed by October 12, 2020. The remaining briefing schedule for Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Docket No. #9 ) shall be as follows: A. Plaintiff's Response shall be filed by September 3, 2020. B. Defendants' Reply shall be filed by September 8, 2020. All discovery relating to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Transfer shall be completed by October 1, 2020. The Parties request a hearing on the pending motions after October 15, 2020 and anticipate the hearing to last a half day. A Settlement Conference is set for 9/24/2020 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) in room #328, United States Courthouse, 101 Northwest MLK Boulevard, Evansville, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
August 28, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Protective Order , or, in the Alternative, to Extend Time for Responses to Discovery, filed by Defendant RYAN CAMPBELL. (House, Briane)
August 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance, filed by Defendants RYAN CAMPBELL, INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC (House, Briane)
August 28, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER , filed by Defendant RYAN CAMPBELL. (House, Briane)
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER , filed by Defendant INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (House, Briane)
August 28, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Removal (Amended), filed by Defendant INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (House, Briane)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING HEARING - The Plaintiff's Motions For Preliminary Injunction [7, 22] is set for a hearing on October 21, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 202, U.S. Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Copies mailed per distribution list via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/28/2020.(JDH)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Buddy B. Presley, Jr,Terrance L. Jones for INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/26/2020. (JRB)
August 25, 2020 Filing 28 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Seal Document #23 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #20 Remark, #25 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Seal Document #23 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #20 Remark, #25 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 26 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Againt Ryan Campbell (Redacted, Public Version), filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 SEALED Memorandum in Support of FitzMark's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell, re #22 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionMotion for TRO, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 REDACTION to #23 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) (Exhibit 1 to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell) by FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 23 SEALED Exhibits in Support, re #22 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionMotion for TRO, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JD Davis Declaration, #2 Exhibit 3 - July 20 Campbell Customer Email, #3 Exhibit 4 - July 31 Campbell Customer Email, #4 Exhibit 5 - August 3 (10:19am) Campbell Customer Email, #5 Exhibit 6 - August 3 (10:30am) Campbell Customer Email)(Barr, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Againt Ryan Campbell, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - June 26 Naik Letter, #2 Exhibit 7 - August 21 (3:46pm) Campbell Email, #3 Exhibit 8 - August 21 (4:49pm) Campbell Email, #4 Exhibit 9 - Pannicke Declaration, #5 Exhibit 10 - Campbell LinkedIn Profile, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - In order for the Court to determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction over this matter, the Court ORDERS Infinity to file an Amended Notice of Removal by September 8, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Mr. Campbell and Fitzmark need not respond to the Notice of Removal at which this Order is directed. They are cautioned, however, that when they do respond to the Amended Notice of Removal, and to the extent that they deny any of Infinity's jurisdictional allegations or state that they do not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/25/2020.(JDH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 Receipt of state court record from Marion County Superior Court, cause number 49D01-2008PL-026263. (JDH)
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, to Extend Time for Responses to Discovery, filed by Defendant INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (House, Briane)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 RECEIPT #IP070402 for Pro Hac Vice filing fee in the amount of $200.00, paid by Buddy Presley and Terrance Jones. (REO)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - The above case is hereby assigned for a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE on AUGUST 27, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/21/2020.(AAS)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Buddy B. Presley, Jr.; Terrance L. Jones to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Defendant INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Buddy B. Presley, Jr., #2 Exhibit Certification of Terrance L. Jones, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(House, Briane)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #8 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #11 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #8 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #11 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell, re #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of JD Davis)(Barr, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (House, Briane)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1 -Devang Naik)(House, Briane)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell (Redacted), filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of JD Davis)(Barr, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Ryan Campbell, filed by Plaintiff FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FITZMARK, INC.. (Barr, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (House, Briane)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (House, Briane)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Briane M. House on behalf of Defendant INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (House, Briane)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Commercial Court, case number 49D01-2008-PL-026263, filed by INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6139076) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, Summons, #2 Exhibit Statement of Foreign Business, #3 State Court Record Notice of Removal)(House, Briane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FITZMARK, INC. v. CAMPBELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INFINITY LOGISTICS GROUP LLC
Represented By: Briane M. House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FITZMARK, INC.
Represented By: Cory Louis Turner
Represented By: Matthew B. Barr
Represented By: Alexander Pape Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN CAMPBELL
Represented By: Buddy B. Presley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?