INTEGRITY KOKOSING PIPELINE SERVICES, L.L.C. v. PIPELINERS UNION 798 UNITED ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: Integrity Kokosing Pipeline Services, L.L.C.
Defendant: Daniel Hendrix, Charles Yates, Jr., Justin Hornback, Pipeliners Union 798 and PIPELINERS UNION 798 UNITED ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02321
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2020.(JRB)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Attorney Louis L. Robein for DANIEL HENDRIX, JUSTIN HORNBACK,PIPELINERS UNION 798 UNITED ASSOCIATION,AND CHARLES YATES, JR added. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Louis L. Robein register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by October 21, 2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/7/2020. (AAS)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Louis L. Robein to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6214014), filed by Defendants DANIEL HENDRIX, JUSTIN HORNBACK, PIPELINERS UNION 798 UNITED ASSOCIATION, CHARLES YATES, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Mason-Smith, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R. Mason-Smith on behalf of Defendants DANIEL HENDRIX, JUSTIN HORNBACK, PIPELINERS UNION 798 UNITED ASSOCIATION, CHARLES YATES, JR. (Mason-Smith, Kevin)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to DANIEL HENDRIX, JUSTIN HORNBACK, PIPELINERS UNION 798 UNITED ASSOCIATION, CHARLES YATES, JR. (AKH)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INTEGRITY KOKOSING PIPELINE SERVICES, L.L.C.. (Martone, Andrew)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw Complaint - Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 6) shall be the operative Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/10/2020. (JRB)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Andrew J. Martone hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Martone, Andrew)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Matthew Blanton Robinson hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Robinson, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (MAC)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Complaint Re-Filed to replace incorrect version previously filed against All Defendants, filed by Integrity Kokosing Pipeline Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pipeliners Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Martone, Andrew)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint Incorrect Version of Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Integrity Kokosing Pipeline Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martone, Andrew)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Blanton Robinson on behalf of Plaintiff Integrity Kokosing Pipeline Services, L.L.C.. (Robinson, Matthew)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Martone on behalf of Plaintiff Integrity Kokosing Pipeline Services, L.L.C.. (Martone, Andrew)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Integrity Kokosing Pipeline Services, L.L.C.. (Martone, Andrew)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Integrity Kokosing Pipeline Services, L.L.C.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6166921) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pipeliners Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Martone, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTEGRITY KOKOSING PIPELINE SERVICES, L.L.C. v. PIPELINERS UNION 798 UNITED ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hendrix
Represented By: Kevin R. Mason-Smith
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Yates, Jr.
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hornback
Represented By: Kevin R. Mason-Smith
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipeliners Union 798
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIPELINERS UNION 798 UNITED ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrity Kokosing Pipeline Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew J. Martone
Represented By: Matthew Blanton Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?