SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC. v. LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.
Defendant: LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02356
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert John Theuerkauf on behalf of Defendant LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Theuerkauf, Robert)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Parties' Joint #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint to 11/16/2020. In addition, on or before November 6, 2020, Robert J. Theuerkauf (on whose behalf the motion was filed) shall enter his appearance in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Email copy of Order to Robert J. Theuerkauf sent by CRD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/30/2020. (MAC)
October 28, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 16, 2020 for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [Filing No. 18], filed by Plaintiff SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Joshua)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Second Amended Complaint in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint filed 10/02/2020) (JDH)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Taggart, Leigh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) for Patent Infringement against LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, filed by SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 8,038,366, #2 Exhibit B - July 30, 2020 Cease and Desist Letter to D. Ring)(Taggart, Leigh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION (Joint), filed by Plaintiff SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Taggart, Leigh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Amended Complaint in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Amended complaint filed 09/17/2020, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,038,366, #3 Exhibit B - 2020-07-30 Cease and Desist Letter) (JDH)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Sarah E. Waidelich for SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC. added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Sarah E. Waidelich is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Sarah E. Waidelich via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/17/2020. (SWM)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Leigh C. Taggart for SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC. added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Leigh C. Taggart is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Leigh C. Taggart via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/17/2020. (SWM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, filed by SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,038,366, #2 Exhibit B - 2020-07-30 Cease and Desist Letter)(Larsen, Joshua)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Judge James R. Sweeney II is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-02356-JMS-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 9/16/2020. (BRR)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of Service, filed by SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION served on 9/14/2020. (Larsen, Joshua)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (JDC)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah E. Waidelich to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6175942), filed by Plaintiff SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Sarah E. Waidelich, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Joshua)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Leigh C. Taggart to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6175926), filed by Plaintiff SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Leigh C. Taggart, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Joshua)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (DJH)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Larsen, Joshua)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Larsen on behalf of Plaintiff SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Larsen, Joshua)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6173667) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,038,366, #2 Exhibit B - 2020-07-30 Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Larsen, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC. v. LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIGCHINE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert John Theuerkauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOMERO ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Joshua P. Larsen
Represented By: Leigh C. Taggart
Represented By: Sarah E. Waidelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?