BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION v. PEAKS 2009-1 et al
Plaintiff: BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION
Defendant: PEAKS 2009-1, DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS, DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY DELAWARE and DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02386
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLOSED JUDGMENT - STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL**** Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/1/2020.(JDC)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDH)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION For Entry of Final Judgment, filed by Plaintiff BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Final Judgment and Order)(Reischl, Jonathan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben T. Caughey on behalf of Defendants DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS, DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY DELAWARE, PEAKS 2009-1. (Caughey, Ben)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel German Arreaza on behalf of Plaintiff BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (Arreaza, Manuel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen E. McOwen on behalf of Plaintiff BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (McOwen, Maureen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hjalmer Reischl on behalf of Plaintiff BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (Reischl, Jonathan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reischl, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION v. PEAKS 2009-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEAKS 2009-1
Represented By: Ben T. Caughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS
Represented By: Ben T. Caughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY DELAWARE
Represented By: Ben T. Caughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: Ben T. Caughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION
Represented By: Manuel German Arreaza
Represented By: Jonathan Hjalmer Reischl
Represented By: Maureen E. McOwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?