DJENGUE v. LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC
Plaintiff: ALEX DJENGUE and ALEX H. DJENGUE
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC and LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02411
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC.(Farris-Niehaus, Justine)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2020 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/28/2020.(SWM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Farris-Niehaus, Justine)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. for LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC.. (Farris-Niehaus, Justine)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justine Farris-Niehaus on behalf of Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Farris-Niehaus, Justine)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Pryzbylski on behalf of Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Pryzbylski, David)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (AKH)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A. Stowers on behalf of Plaintiff ALEX DJENGUE. (Stowers, Gregory)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC, filed by ALEX DJENGUE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6184295) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Stowers, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DJENGUE v. LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: Justine Farris-Niehaus
Represented By: David J. Pryzbylski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX DJENGUE
Represented By: Gregory A. Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX H. DJENGUE
Represented By: Gregory A. Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?