TAYLOR v. ZATECKY et al
Plaintiff: QUENTIN L. TAYLOR
Defendant: CARTER, AARON SMITH, DUSHAN ZATECKY, RATTIN, DAVIS, MASON, C. CONYERS, EARNEST, NURSE #2, WEXFORD MEDICAL OF INDIANA, GREY, NURSE #1, RINEHART, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR., GROSS, LAMAR and WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02413
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC.. WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC. waiver sent on 10/8/2020. (VanTyle, Emily)
November 2, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by GREY(Dr.), LAMAR. GREY(Dr.) waiver sent on 10/8/2020; LAMAR waiver sent on 10/8/2020. (VanTyle, Emily)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kathleen VanTyle on behalf of Defendants GREY, LAMAR, WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC.. (VanTyle, Emily)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Terese Gilbert on behalf of Defendants GREY, LAMAR, WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC.. (Gilbert, Heather)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #8 Order, #9 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk sent to GREY(Dr.) at Pendleton, No longer here. (MAC)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE, re #8 Order, filed by Plaintiff QUENTIN L. TAYLOR. (JDC)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 Documents to be Sent via Electronic Notice - re #8 Order, #9 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #1 Complaint Electronic Notice to IDOC and Wexford. (MAC)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD REFER TO #11 ***Documents to be Sent via Electronic Notice - re #8 Order, #9 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #1 Complaint. (Wexford and IDOC). (MAC) Modified on 10/8/2020 (MAC).
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk. (MAC)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Screening Complaint, Dismissing Insufficient Claims, and Directing Issuance of Process. Mr. Taylor's claims shall proceed as outlined in Section III, supra. These are the only claims the Court discerns in the complaint. If Mr. Taylor believes additional claims were alleged in the complaint, but not identified by the Court, he shall have through November 2, 2020, in which to identify those claims. The clerk is directed to terminate Indiana Department of Corrections, C. Conyers, Nurse #1, and Nurse #2 as defendants on the docket. The clerk is directed to change Wexford's name on the docket from "Wexford Medical of Indiana" to "Wexford of Indiana, LLC.". (See Order). Service copies to Dr. Lamar and Dr. Grey sent via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/7/2020.(MAC)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by QUENTIN L. TAYLOR located at WESTVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by QUENTIN L. TAYLOR to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (DWH)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/18/2020. Copy Sent Via U.S. Mail (CKM)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff QUENTIN L. TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(REO)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff QUENTIN L. TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(REO)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARTER, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, C. CONYERS, DAVIS, EARNEST, GREY(Dr.), GREY(Ofc.), GROSS, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, LAMAR, MASON, NURSE #1, NURSE #2, RATTIN, RINEHART, AARON SMITH, WEXFORD MEDICAL OF INDIANA, DUSHAN ZATECKY, filed by QUENTIN L. TAYLOR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. ZATECKY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUSHAN ZATECKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RATTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. CONYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARNEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD MEDICAL OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREY
Represented By: Heather Terese Gilbert
Represented By: Emily Kathleen VanTyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RINEHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E. CARTER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMAR
Represented By: Heather Terese Gilbert
Represented By: Emily Kathleen VanTyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC.
Represented By: Heather Terese Gilbert
Represented By: Emily Kathleen VanTyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUENTIN L. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?