CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC. et al v. CHANDLER et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN DETRUDE and CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC.
Defendant: SHOW COLORS, INC., MY K9 BEHAVES LLC, DONNA CHANDLER and MY K9 BEHAVES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02488
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on November 20, 2020. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed.This matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on December 17, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), by video teleconference, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The parties shall attend the conference by calling the designated video teleconference information to be provided by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sua sponte now RESCHEDULES the Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for November 19, 2020 to November 20, 2020 at 4:30 p.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/19/2020.(CAG)
November 19, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendants DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC.. (Plopper, Nicholas)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendants DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Plopper, Nicholas)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiffs CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brinkerhoff, William)
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE . (Brinkerhoff, William)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay or Dismiss Answer to #1 Complaint , filed by Plaintiffs CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE. (Brinkerhoff, William)
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case, filed by Defendants DONNA CHANDLER, MY K9 BEHAVES LLC, SHOW COLORS, INC. (Plopper, Stephen)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/28/2020.(SWM)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of #10 MOTION to Sever Stay / Dismiss, MOTION to Stay re #10 Answer to Complaint , filed by Defendants DONNA CHANDLER, MY K9 BEHAVES LLC, SHOW COLORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit Amendment, #3 Exhibit Letter)(Plopper, Stephen) Modified on 10/19/2020 (JDH).
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to Stay or Dismiss ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Plopper, Stephen) Modified on 10/19/2020 (JDH).
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. DONNA CHANDLER served on 9/28/2020; SHOW COLORS, INC. served on 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summonses)(Brinkerhoff, William)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC. (REO)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 09/25/2020, #2 Exhibit A - Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Amendment, #4 Exhibit C - August 19 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit D - September 8 Correspondence) (JDH)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC.. (Brinkerhoff, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Kaufman Joseph on behalf of Plaintiffs CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE. (Joseph, Hannah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Brinkerhoff on behalf of Plaintiffs CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE. (Brinkerhoff, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC., filed by CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6199312) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Amendment, #3 Exhibit C - August 19 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - September 8 Correspondence, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Brinkerhoff, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC. et al v. CHANDLER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN DETRUDE
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC.
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOW COLORS, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Plopper
Represented By: Stephen Edwards Plopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MY K9 BEHAVES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA CHANDLER
Represented By: Nicholas E. Plopper
Represented By: Stephen Edwards Plopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MY K9 BEHAVES, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Edwards Plopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?