STATE OF INDIANA ex rel. THE INDIANA SECRETARY OF STATE v. SIMMONS
Appellee: JAMES R. SIMMONS
Appellant: STATE OF INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02494
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 Notice to District Court: Appellee filed an Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellee Designation. Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to 11/24/2020. (NAR)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to District Court: Appellee filed a Motion to Extend Time to File Appellee Designation. Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to 11/10/2020. (NAR)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Myron Lane Jones on behalf of Appellant STATE OF INDIANA. (Jones, Benjamin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron T. Craft on behalf of Appellant STATE OF INDIANA. (Craft, Aaron)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Parties of Briefing Schedule in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Bankruptcy Rules of Procedure. (JRB)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-2288. File received, filed by STATE OF INDIANA ex rel. THE INDIANA SECRETARY OF STATE.(NAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF INDIANA ex rel. THE INDIANA SECRETARY OF STATE v. SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JAMES R. SIMMONS
Represented By: Amanda D. Stafford
Represented By: Jason T. Mizzell
Represented By: Harley K Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Amanda Koziura Quick
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Benjamin Myron Lane Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?