JANE DOE JJ v. USA GYMNASTICS
Interested Party: TORT CLAIMANTS COMMITTEE
Appellee: USA GYMNASTICS
Appellant: JANE DOE JJ
Case Number: 1:2020cv02507
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Appeal, filed by Appellant JANE DOE JJ. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume I, #2 Appendix Volume II)(Buzin, Andrew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 Supplemental Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re: Bankruptcy Document #1218 (BRB)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Submission of Exhibits A, A and B to Transcript of Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 8/26/2020 before Judge Robyn L. Moberly (NAR)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT of Bankruptcy Court hearing held on 8/26/2020 before Judge Robyn L. Moberly. (50 pages.) For information on obtaining copies, please contact the U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk's Office (Telephone: (317) 229-3800) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2020. (NAR)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(NAR)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Buzin on behalf of Appellant JANE DOE JJ. (Buzin, Andrew)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 ***PLEASE DISERGARD DOCKETED IN ERROR** Notice to District Court: Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Appellant for failure to pay the filing fee. (NAR) Modified on 9/30/2020 (JRB).
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Parties of Briefing Schedule in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Bankruptcy Rules of Procedure. (JRB)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-9108-RLM-11. File received, filed by JANE DOE JJ.(NAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JANE DOE JJ v. USA GYMNASTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TORT CLAIMANTS COMMITTEE
Represented By: Steven W. Golden
Represented By: Deborah J. Caruso
Represented By: Ilan D. Scharf
Represented By: Meredith R. Theisen
Represented By: Kenneth H. Brown
Represented By: James I. Stang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: USA GYMNASTICS
Represented By: Mark D. Stuaan
Represented By: Melissa Megan Root
Represented By: George M. Plews
Represented By: John Thomas Piggins
Represented By: Gregory M. Gotwald
Represented By: Catherine L. Steege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JANE DOE JJ
Represented By: John J. Allman
Represented By: Andrew S. Buzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?