PHILPOT v. MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LARRY G. PHILPOT
Defendant: MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC and THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02712
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
2 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 10/20/2021. Discovery due by 8/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/8/2020.(SWM)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on December 8, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/6/2021 to file response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/7/2020. (CBU)
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to January 6, 2021 in which to #1 Complaint Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC, THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chapelle, Joseph)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference (Time Only) - The court, on its own motion, RESETS the telephone initial pretrial conference set for December 8, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. (Eastern) for December 8, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. (Eastern). All other provisions of the court's Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference (Dkt. #11 ) remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/2/2020.(SWM)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff LARRY G. PHILPOT . (Cole, Stacy)
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by LARRY G. PHILPOT. MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC served on 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Completed Summons)(Cole, Stacy)
November 10, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by LARRY G. PHILPOT. THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION served on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Return Receipts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Executed Summons)(Cole, Stacy)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Richard L. Young. Judge James R. Sweeney II is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-2712-RLY-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 11/3/2020. (BRR)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2020 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/29/2020.(SWM)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mustard Seed Media LLC for MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC.. (Chapelle, Joseph)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION for THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION.. (Chapelle, Joseph)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties First Extension filed by Defendants MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC, THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION, re #1 Complaint. (Chapelle, Joseph) Modified on 10/29/2020 (JDC).
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Chapelle on behalf of Defendants MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC, THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION. (Chapelle, Joseph)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit) (JDC)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC, THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION. (REO)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Ann Cole on behalf of Plaintiff LARRY G. PHILPOT. (Cole, Stacy)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Stephen Smith on behalf of Plaintiff LARRY G. PHILPOT. (Smith, J.)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC, THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION, filed by LARRY G. PHILPOT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6232828) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Main Photo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Infringing Images, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Smith, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILPOT v. MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY G. PHILPOT
Represented By: J. Stephen Smith
Represented By: Stacy Ann Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSTARD SEED MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chapelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROSPER GROUP CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph C. Chapelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?