WOOD v. MCCARTHY
Plaintiff: SEAN E. WOOD
Defendant: RYAN D. MCCARTHY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02795
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on the Defendant filed by Plaintiff, SEAN E. WOOD. (DWH)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by SEAN E. WOOD. (DWH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service RYAN D. MCCARTHY served on 11/2/2020. (JDC)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Additional EXHIBITS - E1 re #6 Brief/Memorandum in Support by SEAN E. WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - E2, #2 Exhibit - E3, #3 Exhibit - F1, #4 Exhibit - F2)(DWH)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff SEAN E. WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D). (MAC)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RYAN D. MCCARTHY. (Copies mailed to Plaintiff for service). (MAC)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 RECEIPT #IP071359 for filing fee in the amount of $400.00, paid by SEAN WOOD. (DJH)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to RYAN D. MCCARTHY. (MAC)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RYAN D. MCCARTHY, filed by SEAN E. WOOD. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOOD v. MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN D. MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN E. WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?