DELTA FAUCET COMPANY v. AS AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation and DELTA FAUCET COMPANY
Defendant: AS AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02796
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael Patrick Kella for DELTA FAUCET COMPANY added. Copy to Kella via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Patrick Kella to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6277311), filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification of Kella, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy and David P. Utykanski for DELTA FAUCET COMPANY added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy, and David P. Utykanski are ordered to register within ten days of the entry of this order. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/6/2020. (SWM)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) George D. Moustakas, Michael P. Doerr, Jewell N. Briggs, Stephanie Lynn Dowdy and David P. Utykanski to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $500, receipt number 0756-6262758), filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification Briggs, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Doerr, #3 Exhibit A-Certification of Dowdy, #4 Exhibit A- Certification of Moustakas, #5 Exhibit A- Certification of Utykanski, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Michael)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Patent Infringement, #2 Exhibit A-Where to buy, #3 Exhibit B-location, #4 Exhibit C-'702 patent, #5 Exhibit D-Nelson Assignment, #6 Exhibit E-'217 patent, #7 Exhibit F-Nelson assignment 479, #8 Exhibit G-'702 patent, #9 Exhibit H-'217 patent) (NAD)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AS AMERICA, INC. (REO)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases, filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Swift on behalf of Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Swift, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AS AMERICA, INC., filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6250373) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Where to buy, #2 Exhibit B-location, #3 Exhibit C-'702 patent, #4 Exhibit D-Nelson Assignment, #5 Exhibit E-'217 patent, #6 Exhibit F-Nelson assignment 479, #7 Exhibit G-'702 patent, #8 Exhibit H-'217 patent, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Swift, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY v. AS AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AS AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY, an Indiana Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Represented By: Michael Patrick Kella
Represented By: Michael P. Doerr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dowdy
Represented By: David P. Utykanski
Represented By: George D. Moustakas
Represented By: Jewell Nile Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?