WHITE v. DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HILLARY WHITE
Defendant: ERIKA CAPPA and DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02885
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by HILLARY WHITE. ERIKA CAPPA waiver sent on 11/5/2020; DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC waiver sent on 11/5/2020. (Lapin, Dmitry)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - granting #12 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Bradley M. Stohry is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff, Hillary White. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/25/2020. (NAD)
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Plaintiff HILLARY WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stohry, Bradley)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Dmitry Lapin for HILLARY WHITE added. Copy to Lapin via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 Submission of Signature Requirement re #9 Notice of Appearance by All Defendants. (Eich, Melanie)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Ann Eich on behalf of Defendants ERIKA CAPPA, DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC. (Eich, Melanie)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Overhauser on behalf of Defendants ERIKA CAPPA, DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC. (Overhauser, Paul)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dmitry Lapin to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6271831), filed by Plaintiff HILLARY WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stohry, Bradley)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. Copy via US Mail to U.S. Copyright Office (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit B - Artwork Comparison, #4 Exhibit C - Transcript) (NAD)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Bradley M. Stohry hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Stohry, Bradley)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ERIKA CAPPA and DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC. (DJH)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley M. Stohry on behalf of Plaintiff HILLARY WHITE. (Stohry, Bradley)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIKA CAPPA, DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC, filed by HILLARY WHITE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6260406) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Artwork Comparison, #3 Exhibit C - Transcript, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons Summons for Cappa, #6 Proposed Summons Summons for Dapper Dudes)(Stohry, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILLARY WHITE
Represented By: Bradley M. Stohry
Represented By: Dmitry Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIKA CAPPA
Represented By: Melanie Ann Eich
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAPPER DUDES & DANES, LLC
Represented By: Melanie Ann Eich
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?