SHOW COLORS, INC. et al v. ZWEIGEL et al
Plaintiff: DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC. and MY K9 BEHAVES, LLC
Defendant: MY K9 BEHAVES LLC, KEVIN DETRUDE, CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC. and KENETH ZWEIGEL
Case Number: 1:2020cv02930
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendants CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE, MY K9 BEHAVES, LLC, KENETH ZWEIGEL. (Brinkerhoff, William)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE, MY K9 BEHAVES, LLC, KENETH ZWEIGEL.(Brinkerhoff, William)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Defendants' Motion to Temporarily Stay or Extend Deadlines Pending Settlement Conference, Dkt. [ #14 ]. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS said Motion. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is hereby STAYED pending the outcome of the December 17, 2020 Settlement Conference in Case No. 1:20-cv-02488-JMS-DLP. If this matter is not resolved at the settlement conference, Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand no later than December 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/2/2020. (SWM)
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #12 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #11 MOTION to Remand Motion to Temporarily Stay or Extend Deadlines Pending Settlement Conference, filed by Defendants CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE, MY K9 BEHAVES, LLC, KENETH ZWEIGEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brinkerhoff, William)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing by DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Motion for Temporary Restraining, #2 State Court Record Memorandum of Law, #3 State Court Record Proposed Order, #4 State Court Record Affidavit of Efforts to Give Notice, #5 State Court Record Affidavit Exhibit A, #6 State Court Record Affidavit Exhibit B, #7 State Court Record Affidavit Exhibit C) (Plopper, Nicholas)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiffs DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC.. (Plopper, Nicholas)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiffs DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Plopper, Nicholas)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Motion to Consolidate by All Defendants (Brinkerhoff, William)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE, MY K9 BEHAVES, LLC, KENETH ZWEIGEL. (Brinkerhoff, William)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Plopper on behalf of Plaintiffs DONNA CHANDLER, SHOW COLORS, INC.. (Plopper, Nicholas)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Pending State Court Motion(s), filed by Defendants CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE, MY K9 BEHAVES LLC, KENETH ZWEIGEL (Brinkerhoff, William)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MY K9 BEHAVES LLC. (Brinkerhoff, William)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC.. (Brinkerhoff, William)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Kaufman Joseph on behalf of Defendants CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE, MY K9 BEHAVES LLC, KENETH ZWEIGEL. (Joseph, Hannah)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Brinkerhoff on behalf of Defendants CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC., KEVIN DETRUDE, MY K9 BEHAVES LLC, KENETH ZWEIGEL. (Brinkerhoff, William)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Superior Court 4, case number 29D04-2010-PL-007352, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6265524) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record (CCS, Complaint, Appearance, Summons to Content & Commerce, Inc., Summons to Kevin DeTrude, Summons to My K9 Behaves, LLC, Summons to Keneth Zweigel, Appearance), #2 Exhibit B - Operative Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brinkerhoff, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHOW COLORS, INC. et al v. ZWEIGEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MY K9 BEHAVES LLC
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN DETRUDE
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENT & COMMERCE, INC.
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENETH ZWEIGEL
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA CHANDLER
Represented By: Nicholas E. Plopper
Represented By: Stephen Edwards Plopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHOW COLORS, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Plopper
Represented By: Stephen Edwards Plopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MY K9 BEHAVES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?