PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. MENARD, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY and PROPERTY OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MENARD, INC., Southwire Company, LLC and KAB Enterprises Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02941
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Kreppein on behalf of Defendant SOUTHWIRE COMPANY, LLC. (Kreppein, Michael)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 1/28/2021 at 09:30 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. All requirements in the order originally setting this conference shall remain in effect. [Filing No. #11 .]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/17/2020. (MAC)
December 17, 2020 Filing 17 MARGINAL ENTRY- #16 Unopposed MOTION - granted the 12/22/2020 telephonic initial pretrial conference and filing of the CMP is vacated (See Entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/17/2020.(CBU)
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to January 18, 2021 to File Case Management Plan, Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of December 22, 2020 Telephonic Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiffs PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROPERTY OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to KAB ENTERPRISES CO. LTD.(DWH)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/15/2021 for Defendant Southwire to respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/11/2020. (CBU)
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROPERTY OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
December 10, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to January 15, 2020 in which to #5 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, #1 Notice of Removal Answer/Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant SOUTHWIRE COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Temple, David)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - This case is assigned for a telephonic initial pretrial conference before United States Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on December 22, 2020, at 11 a.m. (Eastern Time). The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. **SEE ORDER**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/24/2020.(MGG)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MENARD, INC.. (Dilts, Jeremy)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by MENARD, INC..(Dilts, Jeremy)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROPERTY OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L. Moyer on behalf of Plaintiffs PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROPERTY OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant SOUTHWIRE COMPANY, LLC. (Temple, David)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southwire Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Southwire Consolidated, LLC, Corporate Parent Coleman Cable Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent UCI Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Southwire Operations, LLC, Corporate Parent DPR, LLC, Corporate Parent Southwire Holding Company for Southwire Company, LLC.. (Temple, David)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Temple on behalf of Defendant Southwire Company, LLC. (Temple, David)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Indiana Circuit, case number 53C01-2010-CT-001925, filed by Southwire Company, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6267740) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 1st Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration, #5 Consent of Removal)(Temple, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. MENARD, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENARD, INC.
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Dilts
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwire Company, LLC
Represented By: David A. Temple
Represented By: Michael A. Kreppein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAB Enterprises Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kevin L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROPERTY OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kevin L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?