HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER v. CARTER et al
Plaintiff: HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Defendant: MICHELLE METCALF, RICHARD BROWN, RON NEAL, DOES 1-6, JOSHUA WALLEN, DUSHAN ZATECKY, DANIEL BODLOVICH, JOHN GALIPEAU, MARK SEVIER, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR. and WILLIAM "BILL" HYATTE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02979
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 48 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Defenses, and Jury Demand, filed by DANIEL BODLOVICH, RICHARD BROWN, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, JOHN GALIPEAU, WILLIAM "BILL" HYATTE, MICHELLE METCALF, RON NEAL, JOSHUA WALLEN, DUSHAN ZATECKY.(Huffman, Cameron)
January 7, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Robert Carlisle on behalf of Defendants DANIEL BODLOVICH, RICHARD BROWN, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, JOHN GALIPEAU, WILLIAM "BILL" HYATTE, MICHELLE METCALF, RON NEAL, JOSHUA WALLEN, DUSHAN ZATECKY. (Carlisle, Alexander)
January 5, 2021 Filing 45 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. MARK SEVIER served on 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Card - Mark Sevier, #2 USPS Tracking Info - Mark Sevier)(Waples, Richard)
January 4, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron S. Huffman on behalf of Defendants DANIEL BODLOVICH, RICHARD BROWN, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, JOHN GALIPEAU, WILLIAM "BILL" HYATTE, MICHELLE METCALF, RON NEAL, JOSHUA WALLEN, DUSHAN ZATECKY. (Huffman, Cameron)
December 23, 2020 Filing 42 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. RON NEAL served on 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Card for Ron Neal, #2 USPS Tracking Information for Ron Neal)(Waples, Richard)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 12/21/2020. Court & parties discussed Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction; Court will enter schedule by separate order to prepare motion for resolution. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time). *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Regarding Protective Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/21/2020.(CBU)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER: To prepare this matter for resolution of #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Court hereby establishes the deadlines set forth and orders as follows. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/21/2020. (GD)
December 17, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant MARK SEVIER. (Forrest, Adam)
December 17, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Garth Forrest on behalf of Defendant MARK SEVIER. (Forrest, Adam)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/15/2020.(CBU)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The purpose of the conference is to discuss a schedule regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. [Dkt. 10.] Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/15/2020.(CBU)
December 11, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants DANIEL BODLOVICH, RICHARD BROWN, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, JOHN GALIPEAU, WILLIAM "BILL" HYATTE, MICHELLE METCALF, RON NEAL, JOSHUA WALLEN, DUSHAN ZATECKY (Shores, Sarah) Modified on 12/14/2020 (JDC).
December 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Jean Shores on behalf of Defendants DANIEL BODLOVICH, RICHARD BROWN, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, JOHN GALIPEAU, WILLIAM "BILL" HYATTE, MICHELLE METCALF, RON NEAL, JOSHUA WALLEN, DUSHAN ZATECKY. (Shores, Sarah)
December 7, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc N. Zubick on behalf of Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Zubick, Marc)
December 7, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth G. Schuler on behalf of Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Schuler, Kenneth)
December 7, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah W. Wang on behalf of Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Wang, Sarah)
December 7, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Greer M. Gaddie on behalf of Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Gaddie, Greer)
December 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten C. Lee on behalf of Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Lee, Kirsten)
December 2, 2020 Filing 27 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. DANIEL BODLOVICH served on 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Card for Daniel Bodlovich, #2 USPS Tracking for Daniel Bodlovich)(Waples, Richard)
November 25, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Marshall on behalf of Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Marshall, Daniel)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Marc N. Zubick for HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER added. Copy to Zubick via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Sarah W. Wang for HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER added. Copy to Wang via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kenneth G. Schuler for HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER added. Copy to Schuler via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Daniel Marshall for HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER added. Copy to Marshall via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kristen C. Lee for HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER added. Copy to Lee via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Greer M. Gaddie for HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER added. Copy to Gaddie via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2020. (MAC)
November 20, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to MARK SEVIER. (JDC)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARK SEVIER. (Waples, Richard)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to DANIEL BODLOVICH, RICHARD BROWN, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, JOHN GALIPEAU, WILLIAM "BILL" HYATTE, MICHELLE METCALF, RON NEAL, JOSHUA WALLEN, DUSHAN ZATECKY. (AKH)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 RECEIPT #IP071525 for pro hac vice admission fees in the amount of $600.00, paid by Latham Watkins for Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for #4 Greer M. Gaddie, #5 Kirsten C. Lee, #6 Daniel Marshall, #7 Kenneth G. Schuler, #8 Sarah W. Wang, and #9 Marc N. Zubick. (DJH)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Paul Wright In Support of re #11 Brief/Memorandum in Support by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marc N. Zubick to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of Zubick, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah W. Wang to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of Wang, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kenneth G. Schuler to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of Schuler, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel Marshall to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of Marshall, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kirsten C. Lee to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, Certification of Lee, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Greer M Gaddie to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of Gaddie, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Waples on behalf of Plaintiff HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Waples, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6274593) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Waples, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER v. CARTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Represented By: Richard A. Waples
Represented By: Greer M. Gaddie
Represented By: Kenneth G. Schuler
Represented By: Kirsten C. Lee
Represented By: Sarah W. Wang
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Daniel Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE METCALF
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BROWN
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON NEAL
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA WALLEN
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUSHAN ZATECKY
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BODLOVICH
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN GALIPEAU
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK SEVIER
Represented By: Adam Garth Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E. CARTER, JR.
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM "BILL" HYATTE
Represented By: Alexander Robert Carlisle
Represented By: Sarah Jean Shores
Represented By: Cameron S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?