KNIGHT v. ZATECKY et al
Plaintiff: KYLE D. KNIGHT
Defendant: CHRISTINA CONYERS, COOK, DUSHAN ZATECKY, RICHARDSON, DAVID ARNOLD, MASON, JONATHAN C. JACKSON, I. RANDOLPH, A. LONG, VEONYA SHEPARD, LAMAR and GREY
Case Number: 1:2020cv03032
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 Documents to be Sent via Electronic Notice - re #8 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #2 Complaint, #7 Order Electronic Notice to IDOC. (JDC)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk sent to 1) Dushan Zatecky; 2) Lt. Jonathan Jackson; 3) Officer A. Long; 4) Captain Mason; 4) Christina Conyers; 5) Mr. I. Randolph; 6) Ms. Lamar; 7) Mr. Grey; 8) Mr. Richardson; 9) David Arnold; 10) Mr. Cook; and 11) Veonya Shepherd (RAGS) (JDC)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCREENING THE COMPLAINT AND DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS - Plaintiff Kyle Knight, an inmate at Pendleton Correctional Facility ("PCF"), brings this action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 alleging the defendants violated his constitutional rights. Because Mr. Knight is a "prisoner" as defined by 28 U.S.C. 1915A(c), this Court has an obligation under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(a) to screen his complaint before service on the defendants. Mr. Knight's retaliation and excessive force claims shall proceed against Lt. Jackson in his individual capacity. His failure to protect claims shall proceed against all defendants in their individual capacities. The clerk is directed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendants Dushan Zatecky, Lt. Jonathan Jackson, Officer A. Long, Captain Mason, Christina Conyers, Mr. I. Randolph, Ms. Lamar, Mr. Grey, Mr. Richardson, David Arnold, Mr. Cook, and Ms. Veonya Shepherd in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint, dkt. #2 , applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of service of Summons), and this Order. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/14/2021.(JDC)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on In Forma Pauperis Status - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is granted. Although the plaintiff is excused from pre-paying the full filing fee, he still must pay the three hundred and fifty dollar ($350.00) filing fee pursuant to the statutory formula set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) when able. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) ("the prisoner shall be required to pay the full amount of a filing fee."). The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b) (4). Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/3/2020. (JDC)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (TMC)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff KYLE D. KNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Prisoner Account and History)(REO)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DAVID ARNOLD, CHRISTINA CONYERS, COOK, GREY, JONATHAN C. JACKSON, LAMAR, A. LONG, MASON, I. RANDOLPH, RICHARDSON, VEONYA SHEPARD, DUSHAN ZATECKY, filed by KYLE D. KNIGHT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Grievance documents, #2 Cover Letter)(REO)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by KYLE D. KNIGHT located at PENDLETON CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by KYLE D. KNIGHT to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNIGHT v. ZATECKY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA CONYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUSHAN ZATECKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN C. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEONYA SHEPARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE D. KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?