BORJA DE ARGUETA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: Dina Suzana Borja de Argueta
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe #4, Behavioral Interventions, Inc., John Doe #1, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, John Doe #2 and John Doe #3
Case Number: 1:2020cv03093
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to BEHAVIORAL INTERVENTIONS, INC. (NAD)
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BEHAVIORAL INTERVENTIONS, INC.. (Borroto, Gianna)
January 5, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DINA SUZANA BORJA DE ARGUETA. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 12/21/2020. (Borroto, Gianna)
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DINA SUZANA BORJA DE ARGUETA. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 12/28/2020. (Borroto, Gianna)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DINA SUZANA BORJA DE ARGUETA. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 12/14/2020. (Borroto, Gianna)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DINA SUZANA BORJA DE ARGUETA. BEHAVIORAL INTERVENTIONS, INC. served on 12/15/2020. (Borroto, Gianna)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to BEHAVIORAL INTERVENTIONS, INC.(NAD)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BEHAVIORAL INTERVENTIONS, INC.. (Hunter-Bowman, Jess)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to USA - THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (NAD)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hunter-Bowman, Jess)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Gianna Borroto for DINA SUZANA BORJA DE ARGUETA added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Gianna Borroto via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/3/2020. (SWM)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/3/2020. (NAD)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 Submission of Proposed Order , re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff DINA SUZANA BORJA DE ARGUETA. (Hunter-Bowman, Jess)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gianna Borroto to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6300541), filed by Plaintiff DINA SUZANA BORJA DE ARGUETA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification of Gianna Borroto, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunter-Bowman, Jess)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff Dina Suzana Borja de Argueta. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application to Proceed IFP, #2 Addendum to Application to Proceed IFP)(Hunter-Bowman, Jess)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunter-Bowman, Jess)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BORJA DE ARGUETA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behavioral Interventions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Suzana Borja de Argueta
Represented By: Jess Hunter-Bowman
Represented By: Gianna Borroto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?