BALLARD et al v. GRAYSTONE EARTHWORKS INC.
Plaintiff: JOHN BALLARD and MID CENTRAL OPERATING ENGINEERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Defendant: GRAYSTONE EARTHWORKS INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03106
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 CLOSED DISMISSED. ACKNOWLEDGED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - Comes now the Plaintiff, by counsel, and hereby dismiss this action, pursuant to provisions of Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, costs paid. (MARGINAL ENTRY) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/10/2020.(JDC)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs JOHN BALLARD, MID CENTRAL OPERATING ENGINEERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Vlink, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GRAYSTONE EARTHWORKS INC. (DJH)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Vlink on behalf of Plaintiffs JOHN BALLARD, MID CENTRAL OPERATING ENGINEERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Vlink, David)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6301548) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Vlink, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALLARD et al v. GRAYSTONE EARTHWORKS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAYSTONE EARTHWORKS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BALLARD
Represented By: David T. Vlink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MID CENTRAL OPERATING ENGINEERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: David T. Vlink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?