LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC. et al v. DUEKER et al
Plaintiff: LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC. and FALLEN PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Defendant: DEREK S DUEKER, DOE1, byanski and DEREK S. DUEKER
Case Number: 1:2020cv03159
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving 8 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/14/2020. (CBU)
December 12, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Derek S. Dueker on 12/12/2020, filed by FALLEN PRODUCTIONS, INC., LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry S. Culpepper on behalf of Plaintiffs FALLEN PRODUCTIONS, INC., LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DEREK S. DUEKER. (DJH)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to DEREK S DUEKER. (Culpepper, Kerry)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Copyright Report, filed by Plaintiffs FALLEN PRODUCTIONS, INC., LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FALLEN PRODUCTIONS, INC., LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for FALLEN PRODUCTIONS, INC.; Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC... (Culpepper, Kerry)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) DIRECT COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (2) CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (3) DMCA VIOLATIONS (4) BREACH OF CONTRACT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6314694) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 DECLARATION OF DANIEL ARHEIDT, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC. et al v. DUEKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK S DUEKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: byanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK S. DUEKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FALLEN PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?