THRASHER v. CARVANA LLC
Plaintiff: AARON THRASHER
Defendant: CARVANA LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03263
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CARVANA LLC waiver sent on 1/7/2021. Signed 2/1/2021 by Mia Singer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk TO: (1) Carvana LLC. (DWH)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Mr. Thrasher's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is GRANTED. Mr. Thrasher's motion for assistance with recruiting counsel, dkt. #3 , is DENIED without prejudice. If Mr. Thrasher wishes to renew his motion as the case progresses, he may do so. The clerk is directed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3) to issue process to Defendant Carvana LLC in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint, dkt. 1, applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Order (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/6/2021. Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. (DWH)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff AARON THRASHER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AARON THRASHER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARVANA LLC, filed by AARON THRASHER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THRASHER v. CARVANA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARVANA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON THRASHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?