WILLIAMS et al v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: NORMAN R. WILLIAMS
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED and COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2020cv06153
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by NORMAN WILLIAMS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06153-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul)
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06129-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06130-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06132-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06133-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06146-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06148-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06153-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06154-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06172-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06173-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06176-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06177-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06179-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06181-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06182-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06184-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06129-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06130-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06132-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06133-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06146-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06148-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06153-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06154-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06172-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06173-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06176-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06177-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06179-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06181-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06182-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06184-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Stoller, Paul)
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Dalimonte on behalf of Plaintiff NORMAN R. WILLIAMS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06153-RLY-TAB (Dalimonte, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 15 Remark - Case Transferred In from Eastern District of California, Cause No. 2:20-cv-980 on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6151-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Colorado, Cause No. 1:20-cv-1448 on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6152-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Illinois, Cause No. 1:20-cv-2535on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6153-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Middle District of Louisiana, Cause No. 3:20-cv-295 on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6154-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of New Hampshire, Cause No. 1:20-cv-560 on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6155-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of New York, Cause No. 1:20-cv-568 on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6156-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of New York, Cause No. 1:20-cv-569on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6157-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of North Carolina, Cause No. 1:20-cv-117 on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6158-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of North Dakota, Cause No. 3:20-cv-65on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6159-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Wisconsin, Cause No.2:20-cv-756 on 6/10/2020, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:20-cv-6160-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06151-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06152-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06153-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06154-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06155-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06156-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06157-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06158-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06159-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06160-RLY-TAB(LBT)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/10/2020.(LBT)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02535. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana the electronic record. (td, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Mailed notice (td, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, Craig) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
April 24, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. (ng, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
April 24, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Norman R. Williams, Cathryn Denise Williams, Estate of by Gladys Proa Santana (Santana, Gladys) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Norman R. Williams, Cathryn Denise Williams, Estate of by Peter J. Flowers (Flowers, Peter) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Norman R. Williams, Cathryn Denise Williams, Estate of by Craig Daniel Brown (Brown, Craig) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Norman R. Williams, Cathryn Denise Williams, Estate of; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16953912. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Craig) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS et al v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN R. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Gladys Proa Santana
Represented By: Craig D. Brown
Represented By: Peter J. Flowers
Represented By: John A. Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?