PADGETT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ANNETTE PADGETT
Defendant: ANONYMOUS, DNP, APRN-BC, ANONYMOUS INTERN, ANONYMOUS, MSW, ANONYMOUS SERVICES CORP. and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00196
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 CLOSED AGREED JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the United States of America's Notice of Substitution, [Filing No. 3], the Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE the individual Defendants: Anonymous, DNP, APRN-BC; Anonymous, MSW; Anonymous Intern, and Anonymous Services Corp. Having granted the United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT and DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/11/2021.(MAC)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - In light of the pending Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust, Dkt. [ #4 ], the Court now VACATES the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 11, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/10/2021.(SWM)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. This matter is before the Court on the Defendant United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. The Plaintiff has reviewed the motion and is not planning to file a response. Accordingly, the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment is now GRANTED #4 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all of the Plaintiff's claims in this case against the United States are dismissed without prejudice, the parties shall bear their own fees, costs, and expenses. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/10/2021. (MAC)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 Submission of Proposed Order , re #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woods, Shelese)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. (See Order for Instructions). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/24/2021.(MAC)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly S.C. Wojcik on behalf of Plaintiff ANNETTE PADGETT. (Wojcik, Holly)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Michael G. Getty and Philip Edward Kalamaros withdrawn. Copy to Holly S.C. Wojcik via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/27/2021. (SWM)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Defendants ANONYMOUS INTERN, ANONYMOUS SERVICES CORP., ANONYMOUS, DNP, APRN-BC, ANONYMOUS, MSW. (Getty, Michael)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Torres Decl., #2 Exhibit 2, FTCA coverage determination)(Woods, Shelese)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Substitution of Real Party in Interest, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Certification of Scope of Employment) (Woods, Shelese)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendants ANONYMOUS INTERN, ANONYMOUS SERVICES CORP., ANONYMOUS, DNP, APRN-BC, ANONYMOUS, MSW. (Woods, Shelese)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware Circuit/Superior Court, case number 18C01-2010-CT-000111, filed by ANONYMOUS INTERN, ANONYMOUS, MSW, ANONYMOUS, DNP, APRN-BC, ANONYMOUS SERVICES CORP.. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record state court complaint, #2 State Court Record entire state court records, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Shelese)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PADGETT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE PADGETT
Represented By: Holly S.C. Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS, DNP, APRN-BC
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Represented By: Philip Edward Kalamaros
Represented By: Michael G. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS INTERN
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Represented By: Philip Edward Kalamaros
Represented By: Michael G. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS, MSW
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Represented By: Philip Edward Kalamaros
Represented By: Michael G. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS SERVICES CORP.
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Represented By: Philip Edward Kalamaros
Represented By: Michael G. Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?