INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC v. BP HOLDINGS CO., LLC et al
Plaintiff: INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC
Defendant: BP HOLDINGS CO., LLC, AUSTIN BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC, MINNEAPOLIS BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC and SEATTLE BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00344
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Dismissal Order). (MAC)
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 CLOSED DISMISSED - Dismissal with prejudice acknowledged #14 . (Marginal Entry). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/10/2021. (MAC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC. (Polak, Jonathan)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to AUSTIN BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC, BP HOLDINGS CO., LLC, MINNEAPOLIS BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC, SEATTLE BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC. (MAC)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to SEATTLE BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC. (Henke, Steven)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MINNEAPOLIS BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC. (Henke, Steven)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BP HOLDINGS CO., LLC. (Henke, Steven)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to AUSTIN BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC. (Henke, Steven)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Steven T. Henke hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Henke, Steven)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit BP Holdings Co., LLC Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit Letter to North Mass Boulder). (MAC)
February 15, 2021 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven T. Henke on behalf of Plaintiff INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC. (Henke, Steven)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC. (Polak, Jonathan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Polak on behalf of Plaintiff INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC. (Polak, Jonathan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement of Intellectual Property Rights against AUSTIN BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC, BP HOLDINGS CO., LLC, MINNEAPOLIS BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC, SEATTLE BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC, filed by INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6412326) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BP Holdings Co., LLC Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit Letter to North Mass Boulder, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polak, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC v. BP HOLDINGS CO., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP HOLDINGS CO., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNEAPOLIS BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEATTLE BOULDERING PROJECT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANAPOLIS BOULDERING, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan G. Polak
Represented By: Steven T. Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?