DIRCKS et al v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: KATHRYN DIRCKS and BARRY DIRCKS
Defendant: RICHARD PAYNE, JEFFREY KELLER, BENNII WELDY, ANGELA JONES, MICHAEL BAIRD, BRAD DUNN, CHRISTOPHER GIPSON, THOMAS SANTELLI, ERIK FRITH, CHRISTOPHER BURCHAM, RYAN WILLIAMSON, MAIKESHIA L. WALAT, ARLENE PARKER, ANONYMOUS HOSPITALA, JASON REYNOLDS, JASON POTTS, LEIGH A. CASTO, MELINDA A. FINN, BEN PHELPS, REBEKAH MCCLURE, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, ANONYMOUS CENTER A, KYLE R. THOMAS, GINGER W. MOSBAUGH, TOWN OF ZIONSVILLE, ANONYMOUS SPECIALISTS A, BRADLEY KEIFER, ANTHONY HARRIS, BRIAN STEVENSON, RITA A. LANGLOIS, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR B, KYLE T. HEBENSTREIT, TAYLOR NIELSON, MICHAEL BEARD, JULIE A. DENTON, CITY OF LEBANON, MICHAEL NIELSON, CLINTON STEWART, JAMI NICKERSON, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR D, COURTNEY HALL, BRIAN COPE, TOWN OF WHITESTOWN, RYAN MUSGRAVE, NOBUHLE MAMBA-HARDING, JON CRAVENS, CRAIG FOUTS, GABRIEL FRIETSCHE, BOONE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, ADAM DICKERSON, ROBERT HATFIELD, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR A, LEON GOLLADAY, JACOB KING, THOMAS BEARD, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR C, DEBORAH A. CRYDER, AARON SHOOK, LINDSEY BRUCE, LAURI THOMPSON, TED BOLING, MARIUS KLYKKEN, AUSTIN SCOTT, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR F, JULIE CAMDEN, JOE CALDWELL, JOHNATHON BARNES, BOONE COUNTY COUNCIL, HIEDI K. LINDER, DRAKE STERLING, THOMAS CAMERON, KEN CONLEY, DAVID EDWARDS, FRANK CLARK, JESSICA PRUETT, MICHAEL MCNEAR, CHRISTI G. HOLFORD, ALEXANDRA DILLMAN, JACK CALLAHAN, MARY M. HUBBELL, MATTHEW WILLIAMS, SCOTT A. PELLEY, BLAIR N. ROTI, TOWN OF THORNTON, WESLEY GARST, JOSEPH DELAMATER, SHARONDA REED, ROBERT CLUTTER, CHARLES WHITE, RAZUMICH & DELAMATER, P.C., AMBER HEDGES, AUSTIN BONTY, TIFFANY M. ERGUN, CAMDEN & MERIDEW, P.C., KIMBERLY D. ROBINSON, SAMUEL DENNEMANN, BREANNA SHIVELY, ANONYMOUS CORPORATION A, CHRISTOPHER HELMER, BROOKE E. RISCHAR, ROBERT BONDS, LORA A. ESSINGTON, KEVIN N. MYERS, BLAYNE ROOT, CHARLES BATTS, ANISSA L. HOUSE, SCOTT PELL and ANONYMOUS HOSPITAL A doing business as ANONYMOUS CENTER A
Case Number: 1:2021cv00451
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Mario Garcia
2 Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SHARONDA REED. SHARONDA REED waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (McFadden, Kelly)
April 20, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Kathleen McFadden on behalf of Defendant SHARONDA REED. (McFadden, Kelly)
April 20, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Scott DeMario on behalf of Defendant SHARONDA REED. (DeMario, Nicholas)
April 15, 2021 Filing 60 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs. (JDC)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER - The Court, on its own motion, vacates the telephonic initial pretrial conference set for 11 a.m. on May 17, 2021. The newly reassigned Magistrate Judge will reset this conference at a later date. Copies Mailed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/15/2021.(MGG)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2021 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. Plaintiff shall personally participate in this conference by calling chambers directly at 317-229-3660. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties shall tender a proposed CMP no less than 7 days prior to the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/13/2021.(SWM)
April 13, 2021 Filing 57 ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND JURY DEMAND on behalf of Defendant Anonymous Doctor A and Anonymous Specialist A. (Mingus, Ronald)
April 8, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan J. Schueler on behalf of Defendant JASON POTTS. (Schueler, Megan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Ferguson on behalf of Defendant JASON POTTS. (Ferguson, David)
April 7, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Scott DeMario on behalf of Defendants ANONYMOUS CENTER A, ANONYMOUS CORPORATION A, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR B, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR D, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR F, ANONYMOUS HOSPITALA, LEIGH CASTO, DEBORAH CRYDER, JULIE DENTON, TIFFANY ERGUN, LORA ESSINGTON, MELINDA FINN, KYLE HEBENSTREIT, CHRISTI HOLFORD, ANISSA HOUSE, MARY HUBBELL, RITA LANGLOIS, HIEDI LINDER, GINGER MOSBAUGH, KEVIN MYERS, ARLENE PARKER, SCOTT PELLEY, BROOKE RISCHAR, KIMBERLY ROBINSON, BLAIR ROTI, KYLE THOMAS, MAIKESHIA WALAT. (DeMario, Nicholas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ANONYMOUS CENTER A, ANONYMOUS CORPORATION A, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR B, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR D, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR F, ANONYMOUS HOSPITALA, LEIGH CASTO, DEBORAH CRYDER, JULIE DENTON, TIFFANY ERGUN, LORA ESSINGTON, MELINDA FINN, KYLE HEBENSTREIT, CHRISTI HOLFORD, ANISSA HOUSE, MARY HUBBELL, RITA LANGLOIS, HIEDI LINDER, GINGER MOSBAUGH, KEVIN MYERS, ARLENE PARKER, SCOTT PELLEY, BROOKE RISCHAR, KIMBERLY ROBINSON, BLAIR ROTI, KYLE THOMAS, MAIKESHIA WALAT. MAIKESHIA L. WALAT waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (McFadden, Kelly)
April 7, 2021 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (McFadden, Kelly)
April 7, 2021 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (McFadden, Kelly)
April 7, 2021 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (McFadden, Kelly)
April 7, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Kathleen McFadden on behalf of Defendants ANONYMOUS CENTER A, ANONYMOUS CORPORATION A, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR B, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR D, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR F, ANONYMOUS HOSPITALA, LEIGH CASTO, DEBORAH CRYDER, JULIE DENTON, TIFFANY ERGUN, LORA ESSINGTON, MELINDA FINN, KYLE HEBENSTREIT, CHRISTI HOLFORD, ANISSA HOUSE, MARY HUBBELL, RITA LANGLOIS, HIEDI LINDER, GINGER MOSBAUGH, KEVIN MYERS, ARLENE PARKER, SCOTT PELLEY, BROOKE RISCHAR, KIMBERLY ROBINSON, BLAIR ROTI, KYLE THOMAS, MAIKESHIA WALAT. (McFadden, Kelly)
April 5, 2021 Filing 48 Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (1:21-cv-451-JMS-MG), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (JDad)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Lebanon Defendants' #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 5/14/2021. Copy to Plaintiffs via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/31/2021. (SWM)
March 30, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 14, 2021 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendants MICHAEL BAIRD, CHARLES BATTS, TED BOLING, JOE CALDWELL, CITY OF LEBANON, BRIAN COPE, ADAM DICKERSON, DAVID EDWARDS, BEN PHELPS, AUSTIN SCOTT, RYAN WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schneeman, Pamela)
March 30, 2021 Filing 45 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Schneeman, Pamela)
March 30, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela G. Schneeman on behalf of Defendants MICHAEL BAIRD, CHARLES BATTS, TED BOLING, JOE CALDWELL, CITY OF LEBANON, BRIAN COPE, ADAM DICKERSON, DAVID EDWARDS, BEN PHELPS, AUSTIN SCOTT, RYAN WILLIAMSON. (Schneeman, Pamela)
March 30, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Stephenson on behalf of Defendants MICHAEL BAIRD, CHARLES BATTS, TED BOLING, JOE CALDWELL, CITY OF LEBANON, BRIAN COPE, ADAM DICKERSON, DAVID EDWARDS, BEN PHELPS, AUSTIN SCOTT, RYAN WILLIAMSON. (Stephenson, James)
March 26, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by MARIUS KLYKKEN. MARIUS KLYKKEN waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by TOWN OF ZIONSVILLE. TOWN OF ZIONSVILLE waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SAMUEL DENNEMANN. SAMUEL DENNEMANN waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by BRADLEY KEIFER. BRADLEY KEIFER waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by AARON SHOOK. AARON SHOOK waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by DRAKE STERLING. DRAKE STERLING waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CHARLES WHITE. CHARLES WHITE waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by JASON POTTS. JASON POTTS waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by BENNII WELDY. BENNII WELDY waiver sent on 3/3/2021. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Alan Hoffman on behalf of Defendants SAMUEL DENNEMANN, BRADLEY KEIFER, MARIUS KLYKKEN, JASON POTTS, AARON SHOOK, DRAKE STERLING, TOWN OF ZIONSVILLE, BENNII WELDY, CHARLES WHITE. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 25, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RICHARD PAYNE. RICHARD PAYNE waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (Roembke, Blair)
March 25, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ANONYMOUS DOCTOR C. ANONYMOUS DOCTOR C waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (Roembke, Blair)
March 25, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair Martin Roembke on behalf of Defendants ANONYMOUS DOCTOR C, RICHARD PAYNE. (Roembke, Blair)
March 25, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Roth on behalf of Defendants ANONYMOUS DOCTOR C, RICHARD PAYNE. (Roth, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by JULIE CAMDEN. JULIE CAMDEN waiver sent on 3/9/2021. (Olmstead, Patrick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CAMDEN & MERIDEW, P.C.. CAMDEN & MERIDEW, P.C. waiver sent on 3/9/2021. (Olmstead, Patrick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Olmstead, Patrick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick James Olmstead, Jr on behalf of Defendants JULIE CAMDEN, CAMDEN & MERIDEW, P.C.. (Olmstead, Patrick)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Boone County Defendants' #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/23/2021. Copy to Plaintiffs via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/24/2021. (SWM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ANONYMOUS SPECIALISTS A. ANONYMOUS SPECIALISTS A waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (Mingus, Ronald)
March 24, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ANONYMOUS DOCTOR A. ANONYMOUS DOCTOR A waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (Mingus, Ronald)
March 24, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A. Mingus on behalf of Defendants ANONYMOUS DOCTOR A, ANONYMOUS SPECIALISTS A. (Mingus, Ronald)
March 24, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by TOWN OF THORNTON. TOWN OF THORNTON waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (Roberts, Liberty)
March 24, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by FRANK CLARK. FRANK CLARK waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (Roberts, Liberty)
March 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Liberty L. Roberts on behalf of Defendants FRANK CLARK, TOWN OF THORNTON. (Roberts, Liberty)
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 23, 2021 in which to #1 Complaint Answer Complaint, filed by Defendants JOHNATHON BARNES, MICHAEL BEARD, THOMAS BEARD, ROBERT BONDS, AUSTIN BONTY, BOONE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, BOONE COUNTY COUNCIL, CHRISTOPHER BURCHAM, JACK CALLAHAN, THOMAS CAMERON, ROBERT CLUTTER, KEN CONLEY, JON CRAVENS, BRAD DUNN, CRAIG FOUTS, GABRIEL FRIETSCHE, ERIK FRITH, WESLEY GARST, CHRISTOPHER GIPSON, LEON GOLLADAY, ANTHONY HARRIS, ROBERT HATFIELD, CHRISTOPHER HELMER, JEFFREY KELLER, RYAN MUSGRAVE, MICHAEL NIELSON, TAYLOR NIELSON, SCOTT PELL, JASON REYNOLDS, THOMAS SANTELLI, BREANNA SHIVELY, BRIAN STEVENSON, CLINTON STEWART, MATTHEW WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Boone County Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Initial Extension of Time to Answer)(Belch, Paul)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Thomas Belch on behalf of Defendants JOHNATHON BARNES, MICHAEL BEARD, THOMAS BEARD, ROBERT BONDS, AUSTIN BONTY, BOONE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, BOONE COUNTY COUNCIL, CHRISTOPHER BURCHAM, JACK CALLAHAN, THOMAS CAMERON, ROBERT CLUTTER, KEN CONLEY, JON CRAVENS, BRAD DUNN, CRAIG FOUTS, GABRIEL FRIETSCHE, ERIK FRITH, WESLEY GARST, CHRISTOPHER GIPSON, LEON GOLLADAY, ANTHONY HARRIS, ROBERT HATFIELD, CHRISTOPHER HELMER, JEFFREY KELLER, RYAN MUSGRAVE, MICHAEL NIELSON, TAYLOR NIELSON, SCOTT PELL, JASON REYNOLDS, THOMAS SANTELLI, BREANNA SHIVELY, BRIAN STEVENSON, CLINTON STEWART, MATTHEW WILLIAMS. (Belch, Paul)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/23/2021 for the DCS Defendant's to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/23/2021 Copy sent to the Plaintiffs via US Mail (CBU)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 23, 2021 in which to #1 Complaint Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendants LINDSEY BRUCE, ALEXANDRA DILLMAN, COURTNEY HALL, AMBER HEDGES, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, ANGELA JONES, NOBUHLE MAMBA-HARDING, MICHAEL MCNEAR, JAMI NICKERSON, JESSICA PRUETT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time for DCS Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Pope, Adrienne)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Nicole Pope on behalf of Defendant INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES. (Pope, Adrienne)
March 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Blinn on behalf of Defendants LINDSEY BRUCE, ALEXANDRA DILLMAN, COURTNEY HALL, AMBER HEDGES, ANGELA JONES, NOBUHLE MAMBA-HARDING, MICHAEL MCNEAR, JAMI NICKERSON, JESSICA PRUETT. (Blinn, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Nicole Pope on behalf of Defendants LINDSEY BRUCE, ALEXANDRA DILLMAN, COURTNEY HALL, AMBER HEDGES, ANGELA JONES, NOBUHLE MAMBA-HARDING, MICHAEL MCNEAR, JAMI NICKERSON, JESSICA PRUETT. (Pope, Adrienne)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Barrett on behalf of Defendants JACOB KING, BLAYNE ROOT, TOWN OF WHITESTOWN. (Barrett, William)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by JACOB KING, BLAYNE ROOT, TOWN OF WHITESTOWN. TOWN OF WHITESTOWN waiver sent on 3/8/2021. (Paul, Daniel)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Paul on behalf of Defendants JACOB KING, BLAYNE ROOT, TOWN OF WHITESTOWN. (Paul, Daniel)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 MARGINAL ENTRY re Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously. Motion granted. Plaintiffs may proceed using their children's initials in the caption. Copy to Plaintiffs via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/4/2021. (SWM)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ANONYMOUS CENTER A, ANONYMOUS CORPORATION A, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR A, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR B, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR C, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR D, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR F, ANONYMOUS HOSPITALA, ANONYMOUS SPECIALISTS A, MICHAEL BAIRD, JOHNATHON BARNES, CHARLES BATTS, MICHAEL BEARD, THOMAS BEARD, TED BOLING, ROBERT BONDS, AUSTIN BONTY, BOONE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, BOONE COUNTY COUNCIL, LINDSEY BRUCE, CHRISTOPHER BURCHAM, JOE CALDWELL, JACK CALLAHAN, JULIE CAMDEN, CAMDEN & MERIDEW, P.C., THOMAS CAMERON, LEIGH A. CASTO, CITY OF LEBANON, FRANK CLARK, ROBERT CLUTTER, KEN CONLEY, BRIAN COPE, JON CRAVENS, DEBORAH A. CRYDER, JOSEPH DELAMATER, SAMUEL DENNEMANN, JULIE A. DENTON, ADAM DICKERSON, ALEXANDRA DILLMAN, BRAD DUNN, DAVID EDWARDS, TIFFANY M. ERGUN, LORA A. ESSINGTON, MELINDA A. FINN, CRAIG FOUTS, GABRIEL FRIETSCHE, ERIK FRITH, WESLEY GARST, CHRISTOPHER GIPSON, LEON GOLLADAY, COURTNEY HALL, ANTHONY HARRIS, ROBERT HATFIELD, KYLE T. HEBENSTREIT, AMBER HEDGES, CHRISTOPHER HELMER, CHRISTI G. HOLFORD, ANISSA L. HOUSE, MARY M. HUBBELL, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, ANGELA JONES, BRADLEY KEIFER, JEFFREY KELLER, JACOB KING, MARIUS KLYKKEN, RITA A. LANGLOIS, HIEDI K. LINDER, NOBUHLE MAMBA-HARDING, REBEKAH MCCLURE, MICHAEL MCNEAR, GINGER W. MOSBAUGH, RYAN MUSGRAVE, KEVIN N. MYERS, JAMI NICKERSON, MICHAEL NIELSON, TAYLOR NIELSON, ARLENE PARKER, RICHARD PAYNE, SCOTT PELL, SCOTT A. PELLEY, BEN PHELPS, JASON POTTS, JESSICA PRUETT, RAZUMICH & DELAMATER, P.C., SHARONDA REED, JASON REYNOLDS, BROOKE E. RISCHAR, KIMBERLY D. ROBINSON, BLAYNE ROOT, BLAIR N. ROTI, THOMAS SANTELLI, AUSTIN SCOTT, BREANNA SHIVELY, AARON SHOOK, DRAKE STERLING, BRIAN STEVENSON, CLINTON STEWART, KYLE R. THOMAS, LAURI THOMPSON, TOWN OF THORNTON, TOWN OF WHITESTOWN, TOWN OF ZIONSVILLE, MAIKESHIA L. WALAT, BENNII WELDY, CHARLES WHITE, MATTHEW WILLIAMS, RYAN WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of summons (large file))(MAC)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 RECEIPT #IP072807 for civil filing fee in the amount of $402.00, paid by plaintiff. (AKH)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously. (REO)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED Notice of Intention to Seek Leave to Proceed Anonymously. (REO)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, part 1 against ANONYMOUS CENTER A, ANONYMOUS CORPORATION A, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR A, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR B, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR C, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR D, ANONYMOUS DOCTOR F, ANONYMOUS HOSPITALA, ANONYMOUS SPECIALISTS A, MICHAEL BAIRD, JOHNATHON BARNES, CHARLES BATTS, MICHAEL BEARD, THOMAS BEARD, TED BOLING, ROBERT BONDS, AUSTIN BONTY, BOONE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, BOONE COUNTY COUNCIL, LINDSEY BRUCE, CHRISTOPHER BURCHAM, JOE CALDWELL, JACK CALLAHAN, JULIE CAMDEN, CAMDEN & MERIDEW, P.C., THOMAS CAMERON, LEIGH A. CASTO, CITY OF LEBANON, FRANK CLARK, ROBERT CLUTTER, KEN CONLEY, BRIAN COPE, JON CRAVENS, DEBORAH A. CRYDER, JOSEPH DELAMATER, SAMUEL DENNEMANN, JULIE A. DENTON, ADAM DICKERSON, ALEXANDRA DILLMAN, BRAD DUNN, DAVID EDWARDS, TIFFANY M. ERGUN, LORA A. ESSINGTON, MELINDA A. FINN, CRAIG FOUTS, GABRIEL FRIETSCHE, ERIK FRITH, WESLEY GARST, CHRISTOPHER GIPSON, LEON GOLLADAY, COURTNEY HALL, ANTHONY HARRIS, ROBERT HATFIELD, KYLE T. HEBENSTREIT, AMBER HEDGES, CHRISTOPHER HELMER, CHRISTI G. HOLFORD, ANISSA L. HOUSE, MARY M. HUBBELL, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES, ANGELA JONES, BRADLEY KEIFER, JEFFREY KELLER, JACOB KING, MARIUS KLYKKEN, RITA A. LANGLOIS, HIEDI K. LINDER, NOBUHLE MAMBA-HARDING, REBEKAH MCCLURE, MICHAEL MCNEAR, GINGER W. MOSBAUGH, RYAN MUSGRAVE, KEVIN N. MYERS, JAMI NICKERSON, MICHAEL NIELSON, TAYLOR NIELSON, ARLENE PARKER, RICHARD PAYNE, SCOTT PELL, SCOTT A. PELLEY, BEN PHELPS, JASON POTTS, JESSICA PRUETT, RAZUMICH & DELAMATER, P.C., SHARONDA REED, JASON REYNOLDS, BROOKE E. RISCHAR, KIMBERLY D. ROBINSON, BLAYNE ROOT, BLAIR N. ROTI, THOMAS SANTELLI, AUSTIN SCOTT, BREANNA SHIVELY, AARON SHOOK, DRAKE STERLING, BRIAN STEVENSON, CLINTON STEWART, KYLE R. THOMAS, LAURI THOMPSON, TOWN OF THORNTON, TOWN OF WHITESTOWN, TOWN OF ZIONSVILLE, MAIKESHIA L. WALAT, BENNII WELDY, CHARLES WHITE, MATTHEW WILLIAMS, RYAN WILLIAMSON, filed by BARRY DIRCKS, KATHRYN DIRCKS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, part 2, #2 Proposed Summons)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIRCKS et al v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD PAYNE
Represented By: Blair Martin Roembke
Represented By: Michael Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY KELLER
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENNII WELDY
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA JONES
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BAIRD
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD DUNN
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER GIPSON
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS SANTELLI
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIK FRITH
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER BURCHAM
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIKESHIA L. WALAT
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARLENE PARKER
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HOSPITALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON REYNOLDS
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON POTTS
Represented By: David L. Ferguson
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Represented By: Megan J. Schueler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEIGH A. CASTO
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELINDA A. FINN
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN PHELPS
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBEKAH MCCLURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS CENTER A
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE R. THOMAS
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINGER W. MOSBAUGH
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF ZIONSVILLE
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS SPECIALISTS A
Represented By: Ronald A. Mingus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY KEIFER
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY HARRIS
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN STEVENSON
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITA A. LANGLOIS
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS DOCTOR B
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE T. HEBENSTREIT
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR NIELSON
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BEARD
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE A. DENTON
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LEBANON
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL NIELSON
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON STEWART
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMI NICKERSON
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS DOCTOR D
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURTNEY HALL
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN COPE
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF WHITESTOWN
Represented By: Daniel J. Paul
Represented By: William W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN MUSGRAVE
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOBUHLE MAMBA-HARDING
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON CRAVENS
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG FOUTS
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIEL FRIETSCHE
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOONE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM DICKERSON
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT HATFIELD
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS DOCTOR A
Represented By: Ronald A. Mingus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEON GOLLADAY
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACOB KING
Represented By: Daniel J. Paul
Represented By: William W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS BEARD
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS DOCTOR C
Represented By: Blair Martin Roembke
Represented By: Michael Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH A. CRYDER
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON SHOOK
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDSEY BRUCE
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURI THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TED BOLING
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIUS KLYKKEN
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN SCOTT
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS DOCTOR F
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE CAMDEN
Represented By: Patrick James Olmstead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE CALDWELL
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNATHON BARNES
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOONE COUNTY COUNCIL
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIEDI K. LINDER
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAKE STERLING
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS CAMERON
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN CONLEY
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID EDWARDS
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK CLARK
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA PRUETT
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MCNEAR
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTI G. HOLFORD
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRA DILLMAN
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK CALLAHAN
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY M. HUBBELL
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW WILLIAMS
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT A. PELLEY
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAIR N. ROTI
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF THORNTON
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESLEY GARST
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH DELAMATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARONDA REED
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CLUTTER
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES WHITE
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAZUMICH & DELAMATER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER HEDGES
Represented By: Michael J. Blinn
Represented By: Adrienne Nicole Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN BONTY
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIFFANY M. ERGUN
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN & MERIDEW, P.C.
Represented By: Patrick James Olmstead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY D. ROBINSON
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL DENNEMANN
Represented By: Douglas Alan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREANNA SHIVELY
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS CORPORATION A
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER HELMER
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKE E. RISCHAR
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BONDS
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORA A. ESSINGTON
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN N. MYERS
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAYNE ROOT
Represented By: Daniel J. Paul
Represented By: William W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES BATTS
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANISSA L. HOUSE
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT PELL
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANONYMOUS HOSPITAL A doing business as ANONYMOUS CENTER A
Represented By: Nicholas Scott DeMario
Represented By: Kelly Kathleen McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN DIRCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY DIRCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?