UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHADOAN et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James J Shadoan, Christine A Craig, State of Indiana, Department of Revenue, CHRISTINE A. CRAIG and JAMES J. SHADOAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00560
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate, filed by Defendants CHRISTINE A. CRAIG, JAMES J. SHADOAN, re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate) (Gilday, James)
April 30, 2021 Filing 18 Submission of Proposed Order , re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 19, 2021 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants CHRISTINE A. CRAIG, JAMES J. SHADOAN. (Gilday, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 19, 2021 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants CHRISTINE A. CRAIG, JAMES J. SHADOAN. (Gilday, James)
April 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE - United States' Response to Notice of Related Action, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re #13 Notice of Related Action. (Nunez, Jeffrey). Updated docket text to match title of document - Modified on 4/12/2021 (AKH).
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. Judge Sarah Evans Barker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-00560-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:20-cv-02538-TWP-MJD. Judge Sarah Evans Barker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/8/2021. (LDH)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Action, filed by Defendants CHRISTINE A. CRAIG, JAMES J. SHADOAN, re #1 Complaint. (Gilday, James)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants CHRISTINE A. CRAIG, JAMES J. SHADOAN. (Gilday, James)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Gilday on behalf of Defendants CHRISTINE A. CRAIG, JAMES J. SHADOAN. (Gilday, James)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Earls on behalf of Defendant STATE OF INDIANA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE. (Earls, Kelly)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Austin Rowlett on behalf of Defendant STATE OF INDIANA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE. (Rowlett, Robert)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christine A. Craig on 3/18/2021, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on James J. Shadoan on 3/18/2021, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. STATE OF INDIANA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE waiver sent on 3/17/2021. (Primeaux, Samantha)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CHRISTINE A. CRAIG, JAMES J. SHADOAN, STATE OF INDIANA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE. (REO)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Nathan Nunez on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Suzanne Primeaux on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Primeaux, Samantha)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nunez, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHADOAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J Shadoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine A Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Indiana, Department of Revenue
Represented By: Kelly Earls
Represented By: Robert Austin Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE A. CRAIG
Represented By: James K. Gilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES J. SHADOAN
Represented By: James K. Gilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey Nathan Nunez
Represented By: Samantha Suzanne Primeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?