EPITOPIX, LLC D v. ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INCORPORATED
Plaintiff: EPITOPIX, LLC D/B/A VAXXINOVAUSA and EPITOPIX, LLC doing business as VAXXINOVA US
Defendant: ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INCORPORATED and ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00712
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 memorandum in support of motion to dismiss, #2 proposed order)(Phipps, Sean)
May 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Hunt on behalf of Defendant ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH, INC.. (Hunt, Paul)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Andrew K. Gonsalves for EPITOPIX, LLC added. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Andrew K. Gonsalves register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by May 17, 2021. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/3/2021. (AAS)
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew K. Gonsalves to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6539010), filed by Plaintiff EPITOPIX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Gonsalves Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order )(Warr, Alastair) Modified on 5/3/2021 (CKM).
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/20/2021.(JRB)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Larsen on behalf of Defendant ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH, INC.. (Larsen, Joshua)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Phipps on behalf of Defendant ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH, INC.. (Phipps, Sean)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Plaintiff EPITOPIX, LLC. (Warr, Alastair)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Compliant) (CKM)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christopher R. Kinkade for EPITOPIX, LLC added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/31/2021. (JRB)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher R. Kincade to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6482621), filed by Plaintiff EPITOPIX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Kincade Certifiication, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Warr, Alastair)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH, INC. (REO)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REPORT OF FILING PATENT ACTION, filed by Plaintiff EPITOPIX, LLC D/B/A VAXXINOVAUSA (Warr, Alastair)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alastair J. Warr on behalf of Plaintiff EPITOPIX, LLC D/B/A VAXXINOVAUSA. (Warr, Alastair)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EPITOPIX, LLC D/B/A VAXXINOVAUSA identifying Corporate Parent VAXXINOVA INTERNATIONAL BV for EPITOPIX, LLC D/B/A VAXXINOVAUSA.. (Warr, Alastair)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6472957) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit EX A US PATENT 8282941, #4 Exhibit EX B US PATENT 7943150, #5 Exhibit EX C US PATENT 7943151)(Warr, Alastair)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EPITOPIX, LLC D v. ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Joshua P. Larsen
Represented By: Paul B. Hunt
Represented By: Sean Michael Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPITOPIX, LLC D/B/A VAXXINOVAUSA
Represented By: Alastair J. Warr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPITOPIX, LLC doing business as VAXXINOVA US
Represented By: Alastair J. Warr
Represented By: Christopher R. Kinkade
Represented By: Andrew K. Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?