VROOM, INC. v. MIDWEST MOTORS LLC et al
Plaintiff: VROOM, INC.
Defendant: MIDWEST MOTORS LLC doing business as VROOMSACE CAR SELECTION and KHALED ALRAGWI
Case Number: 1:2021cv00715
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 11:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/5/2021.(CBU) Modified on 5/6/2021 (CBU)Copy sent via US Mail
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Answer in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Answer) (AKH)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by KHALED ALRAGWI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Envelope).(AKH)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Khaled A. Alragwi on April 8, 2021, filed by VROOM, INC.. (Wong, David)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Midwest Motors LLC on March 25, 2021, filed by VROOM, INC.. (Wong, David)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint) Copies mailed. (RSF)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to KHALED ALRAGWI, MIDWEST MOTORS LLC. (REO)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin R. Byczko on behalf of Plaintiff VROOM, INC.. (Byczko, Caitlin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VROOM, INC.. (Wong, David)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. W. Wong on behalf of Plaintiff VROOM, INC.. (Wong, David)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by VROOM, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6473538) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Printout from Ind. Sec. of State Database, #2 Exhibit B - Copies of Registrations, #3 Civil Cover Sheet , #4 Proposed Summons)(Wong, David) Modified on 3/25/2021 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VROOM, INC. v. MIDWEST MOTORS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VROOM, INC.
Represented By: David A. W. Wong
Represented By: Caitlin R. Byczko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST MOTORS LLC doing business as VROOMSACE CAR SELECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHALED ALRAGWI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?