DELTA FAUCET COMPANY v. IAKOVLEV et al
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY
Defendant: JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #1, DMITRII IAKOVLEV, JOHN DOE #9, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #2, JOHN DOE #6 and JOHN DOE #10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00733
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(Perry, Louis)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Amended Complaint, and Court's Order served on Dmitrii Iakovlev on 4/7/2021, filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Perry, Louis)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to allow alternative service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/7/2021. (CBU)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process , filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Perry, Louis)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process, filed by Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Martha Motley, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perry, Louis)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY.(Perry, Louis)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DMITRII IAKOVLEV. (REO)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent MASCO CORPORATION OF INDIANA, Corporate Parent MASCO CORPORATION for DELTA FAUCET COMPANY.. (Perry, Louis)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis T. Perry on behalf of Plaintiff DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Perry, Louis)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DELTA FAUCET COMPANY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6477681) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Perry, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY v. IAKOVLEV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMITRII IAKOVLEV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELTA FAUCET COMPANY
Represented By: Louis T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?