NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC. v. GANNETT CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.
Defendant: THE ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC. and ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01116
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NPA Complaint against Germantown, #2 Exhibit B - NPA Complaint against Trenton, #3 Exhibit C - Kingston Police Scam Alert, #4 Exhibit D - Storm Lake Police Scam Alert, #5 Exhibit E - Mancos Police Scam Alert, #6 Exhibit F - Granville Police Scam Alert, #7 Exhibit G - Buckland Police Scam Alert, #8 Exhibit H - Lubbock Police Scam Alert, #9 Exhibit I - Swanton Police Scam Alert, #10 Exhibit J - Order dismissing NPA's suit against Trenton, #11 Exhibit K - Transcript of hearing on motion to dismiss NPA's suit against Trenton, #12 Exhibit L - Sack on Defamation 7.2.2)(Betz, Tracy)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Daniel H. Bryan for ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC. and GANNETT CO., INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Daniel H. Bryan via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/29/2021. (SWM)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel H. Bryan to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6624954), filed by Defendants ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certification of Daniel H. Bryan in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Betz, Tracy)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GANNETT CO., INC. identifying Other Affiliate THE VANGUARD GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate BLACKROCK FUND ADVISORS, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc for GANNETT CO., INC... (Betz, Tracy)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Lynn Rowe Larsen for ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC. and GANNETT CO., INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Lynn Rowe Larsen via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/3/2021. (SWM)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.. ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC. waiver sent on 5/3/2021. (Milbank, Courtney)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.. GANNETT CO., INC. waiver sent on 5/3/2021. (Milbank, Courtney)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lynn Rowe Larsen to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6591802), filed by Defendants ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certification of Lynn Rowe Larsen in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Betz, Tracy)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC.. (Betz, Tracy)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Nicole Betz on behalf of Defendants ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC.. (Betz, Tracy)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Joseph D. Maughon for NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Joseph D. Maughon via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/18/2021. (SWM)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph D. Maughon to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6562769), filed by Plaintiff NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Joseph D. Maughon in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Milbank, Courtney)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC. identifying Corporate Parent National Police Association Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. for NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC... (Milbank, Courtney)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James Bopp, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Bopp, James)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Turner Milbank on behalf of Plaintiff NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Milbank, Courtney)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Gannett Co., Inc. on 5/3/2021, filed by Plaintiff NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Milbank, Courtney)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to The Associated Press, Inc. on 5/3/2021, filed by Plaintiff NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Milbank, Courtney)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6542080) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification of NPA, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit 1 - "Scam" Article, #4 Exhibit 2 - Police Question Authenticity of Nonprofit's Fundraising, #5 Exhibit 3 - "Suing" Article, #6 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Steven R. Kreklow, #7 Exhibit 5 - Trenton Facebook Post, #8 Exhibit 6 - Belle Isle Facebook Post, #9 Exhibit 7 - Gannett Letter 1, #10 Exhibit 8 - Gannett Response 1, #11 Exhibit 9 - AP Letter, #12 Exhibit 10 - AP Response, #13 Exhibit 11 - Gannett Letter 2, #14 Exhibit 12 - Gannett Response 2, #15 Exhibit 13 - Letter from Stan V. Smith, Ph.D., #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Milbank, Courtney) Modified on 5/4/2021 (duplicate docket text removed) (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC. v. GANNETT CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GANNETT CO., INC.
Represented By: Tracy Nicole Betz
Represented By: Lynn Rowe Larsen
Represented By: Daniel H. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATED PRESS, INC.
Represented By: Tracy Nicole Betz
Represented By: Lynn Rowe Larsen
Represented By: Daniel H. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL POLICE ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Maughon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?