MERCER v. NFL ENTERPRISES LLC
Plaintiff: DE'JOURE MERCER
Defendant: NFL ENTERPRISES LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01713
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia.The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 7/20/2021.(CBU)
July 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant NFL ENTERPRISES LLC. (Hull, Andrew)
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NFL ENTERPRISES LLC identifying Corporate Parent NFL Ventures, L.P. for NFL ENTERPRISES LLC.. (Hull, Andrew)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelee Amanda John on behalf of Defendant NFL ENTERPRISES LLC. (John, Chelee)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Hull on behalf of Defendant NFL ENTERPRISES LLC. (Hull, Andrew)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jeffrey A. Standen for DE'JOURE MERCER added.Applicant, Jeffrey A. Standen shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 7/14/2021 Copy sent to Mr. Standen via US Mail (CBU)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney J. Will Huber for DE'JOURE MERCER added. Applicant, J. WIll Huber shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 7/14/2021 Copy sent to Mr. Huber via US Mail (CBU)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Todd V. McMurty for DE'JOURE MERCER added. Applicant, Todd V. McMurtry shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 7/14/2021 Copy sent to Mr. McMurty via US Mail (CBU)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 RECEIPT #IP074854 for Pro Hac Vice fee in the amount of $100, paid by Jeffrey A. Standen. (LMK)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 RECEIPT #IP074853 for Pro Hac Vice fee in the amount of $100, paid by J. Will Huber. (LMK)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 RECEIPT #IP074852 for Pro Hac Vice fee in the amount of $100, paid by Todd McMurtry. (LMK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey A. Standen to Appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff, De"Joure Mercer (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff DE'JOURE MERCER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of Jeffrey A. Standen, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Standen)(Relford, Guy)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) J. Will Huber to Appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff, De"Joure Mercer (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff DE'JOURE MERCER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of J. Will Huber, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Will Huber)(Relford, Guy)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Todd V. McMurtry to Appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff, De"Joure Mercer (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff DE'JOURE MERCER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of Todd V. McMurtry, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Admission Pro Hac Vice of Todd V. McMurtry)(Relford, Guy)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NFL ENTERPRISES LLC. (LMK)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Guy A. Relford on behalf of Plaintiff DE'JOURE MERCER. (Relford, Guy)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NFL ENTERPRISES LLC, filed by DE'JOURE MERCER. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6609107) (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Relford, Guy) Modified on 6/15/2021 (LMK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCER v. NFL ENTERPRISES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DE'JOURE MERCER
Represented By: Guy A. Relford
Represented By: J. Will Huber
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Standen
Represented By: Todd V. McMurtry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Hull
Represented By: Chelee Amanda John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?