VALQARI LLC v. DRONEDEK CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: VALQARI LLC
Defendant: DRONEDEK CORPORATION, DRONEDEK LLC and DANIEL O'TOOLE
Case Number: 1:2021cv01754
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2021 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/9/2021.(SWM)
August 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants DRONEDEK CORPORATION, DRONEDEK LLC, DANIEL O'TOOLE. (Ritchison, John)
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by VALQARI LLC. DRONEDEK CORPORATION served on 7/20/2021; DRONEDEK LLC served on 7/20/2021; DANIEL O'TOOLE served on 7/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Service on Dronedek Corporation, #2 Affidavit Return of Service on Dronedek LLC, #3 Affidavit Return of Service on Daniel O'Toole)(Alex, Louis)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, John D. Ritchison hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. John D Ritchison 12066-48 (Ritchison, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Ritchison on behalf of Defendants DRONEDEK CORPORATION, DRONEDEK LLC, DANIEL O'TOOLE. (Ritchison, John)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 2-Ex. 1-Aug 2018 Magazine Article, #4 Exhibit 3-Ex. 2-Copyright Registration No. VA 2-242-684, #5 Exhibit 4-Ex. 3-Materials Filed with Copyright Application, #6 Exhibit 5-Ex. 4-Photo of box, #7 Exhibit 6-Ex. 5-Photo of drone, #8 Exhibit 7-Ex. 6-Valqari.com web page, #9 Exhibit 8-Ex. 7-Copyright Registration No. VA 2-250-479, #10 Exhibit 9-Ex. 8-box at homes photo, #11 Exhibit 10-Ex. 9-Valqari LLC Page on Dronemajor.com, #12 Exhibit 11-Ex. 10-Dronemajor.com Advertisement for Smart Mailbox, #13 Exhibit 12-Ex. 11-Advertisement for AUVSI, #14 Exhibit 13-Ex. 12-Advertisement in AUVSI 2019 trade show, #15 Exhibit 14-Ex. 13-2nd Ad for AUVSI 2019 show, #16 Exhibit 15-Ex. 14-GPS Magazine Article, #17 Exhibit 16-Ex. 15-Dronedek Document, #18 Exhibit 17-Ex. 16-Document Properties, #19 Exhibit 18-Ex. 17-Metadata Analysis, #20 Exhibit 19-Ex. 18-Metadata Analysis 2, #21 Exhibit 20-Ex. 19-Dronedek Webpage, #22 Exhibit 21-Ex. 20-Article 3, #23 Exhibit 22-Ex. 21-Article 4, #24 Exhibit 23-Ex. 22-wefunder.com website, #25 Exhibit 24-Ex. 23-Article 5, #26 Exhibit 25-Ex. 24-Article 6, #27 Exhibit 26-Ex. 25-Photo of Dronedek booth, #28 Exhibit 27-Ex. 26-Dronedek FB page, #29 Exhibit 28-Ex. 27-Dronedek Twitter Page, #30 Exhibit 29-Ex. 28-Dronedek LinkedIn, #31 Exhibit 30-Ex. 29-1st Dronedek Ad, #32 Exhibit 31-Ex. 30-2nd Dronedek Ad, #33 Exhibit 32-Ex. 31-3rd Dronedek Ad, #34 Exhibit 33-Ex. 32-Dronedek Presentation) (MAC)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Louis J. Alex for VALQARI LLC added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Louis J. Alex is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Louis J. Alex via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/17/2021. (SWM)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to DRONEDEK CORPORATION, DRONEDEK LLC, DANIEL O'TOOLE. (LMK)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Sahara L. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff VALQARI LLC. (Williams, E. Sahara)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Louis J. Alex to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6613105), filed by Plaintiff VALQARI LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order 02-Proposed Order)(Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VALQARI LLC. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Pollack-Milgate on behalf of Plaintiff VALQARI LLC. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6613090) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 2-Ex. 1-Aug 2018 Magazine Article, #3 Exhibit 3-Ex. 2-Copyright Registration No. VA 2-242-684, #4 Exhibit 4-Ex. 3-Materials Filed with Copyright Application, #5 Exhibit 5-Ex. 4-Photo of box, #6 Exhibit 6-Ex. 5-Photo of drone, #7 Exhibit 7-Ex. 6-Valqari.com web page, #8 Exhibit 8-Ex. 7-Copyright Registration No. VA 2-250-479, #9 Exhibit 9-Ex. 8-box at homes photo, #10 Exhibit 10-Ex. 9-Valqari LLC Page on Dronemajor.com, #11 Exhibit 11-Ex. 10-Dronemajor.com Advertisement for Smart Mailbox, #12 Exhibit 12-Ex. 11-Advertisement for AUVSI, #13 Exhibit 13-Ex. 12-Advertisement in AUVSI 2019 trade show, #14 Exhibit 14-Ex. 13-2nd Ad for AUVSI 2019 show, #15 Exhibit 15-Ex. 14-GPS Magazine Article, #16 Exhibit 16-Ex. 15-Dronedek Document, #17 Exhibit 17-Ex. 16-Document Properties, #18 Exhibit 18-Ex. 17-Metadata Analysis, #19 Exhibit 19-Ex. 18-Metadata Analysis 2, #20 Exhibit 20-Ex. 19-Dronedek Webpage, #21 Exhibit 21-Ex. 20-Article 3, #22 Exhibit 22-Ex. 21-Article 4, #23 Exhibit 23-Ex. 22-wefunder.com website, #24 Exhibit 24-Ex. 23-Article 5, #25 Exhibit 25-Ex. 24-Article 6, #26 Exhibit 26-Ex. 25-Photo of Dronedek booth, #27 Exhibit 27-Ex. 26-Dronedek FB page, #28 Exhibit 28-Ex. 27-Dronedek Twitter Page, #29 Exhibit 29-Ex. 28-Dronedek LinkedIn, #30 Exhibit 30-Ex. 29-1st Dronedek Ad, #31 Exhibit 31-Ex. 30-2nd Dronedek Ad, #32 Exhibit 32-Ex. 31-3rd Dronedek Ad, #33 Exhibit 33-Ex. 32-Dronedek Presentation, #34 Civil Cover Sheet 34-Civil Cover Sheet, #35 Proposed Summons 35-Summons)(Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALQARI LLC v. DRONEDEK CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRONEDEK CORPORATION
Represented By: John D. Ritchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRONEDEK LLC
Represented By: John D. Ritchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL O'TOOLE
Represented By: John D. Ritchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALQARI LLC
Represented By: Deborah Pollack-Milgate
Represented By: E. Sahara L. Williams
Represented By: Louis J. Alex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?