SMITH v. NCF et al
Plaintiff: JAMES SMITH, JR.
Defendant: FREDERICK A. MEDLEY, JAMES W. SHAFFER, CHARLES F. MILLER, NCF, THOR R. MILLER and GWENDOLYN M. HORTH
Case Number: 1:2021cv01794
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 Submission or a Proposed Subpoena, filed by Plaintiff JAMES SMITH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment if evidence does not change from PD Decision, filed by Plaintiff JAMES SMITH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address for JAMES SMITH, JR. 3131 Guilford Ave., Indianapolis, IN 46205 to 707 Mulberry St. #H-17, Lakevillage, AK 71653. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AKH)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, filed by Plaintiff JAMES SMITH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Order and Opportunity to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff JAMES SMITH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(AKH) Modified on 7/28/2021 (MEH).
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DISMISSING COMPLAINT, AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITY TO SHOW CAUSE - Smith's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. The complaint is dismissed for the reasons discussed in this Order. Smith shall have through July 28, 2021, in which to show cause why Judgment consistent with this Order should not issue (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/28/2021. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) Modified on 6/29/2021 (DWH). (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/29/2021) (DWH).
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JAMES SMITH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GWENDOLYN M. HORTH, FREDERICK A. MEDLEY, CHARLES F. MILLER, THOR R. MILLER, NCF, JAMES W. SHAFFER, filed by JAMES SMITH, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. NCF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDERICK A. MEDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES W. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES F. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOR R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GWENDOLYN M. HORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SMITH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?