FITZGERALD et al v. MURRAY et al
Plaintiff: WORLD WISDOM, INC. and MICHAEL FITZGERALD
Defendant: BEACON BOOKS AND MEDIA, LTD and MAUDE MURRAY
Case Number: 1:2021cv01822
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The clerk is directed to send Murray a form motion for this purpose with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/16/2021 Copy sent to Maude Murry via US Mail (Attachments: #1 Form) (CBU)
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Defendant BEACON BOOKS AND MEDIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LBT)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant MAUDE MURRAY. (LBT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2021: #1 Exhibit) (LBT).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION TO STRIKE BEACON BOOKS AND MEDIA, LTD'S MOTION TO DISMISS - Plaintiffs Michael Fitzgerald and World Wisdom, Inc. have filed their Motion to Strike Beacon Books and Media LTD's Motion to Dismiss. The Court, having reviewed the Plaintiffs' motion and being duly advised, hereby GRANTS the Plaintiffs' motion and STRIKES Beacon Books and Media, LTD's Motion for Dismissal as being improperly filed by a corporation unrepresented by legal counsel. The Court directs the Clerk to STRIKE Beacon Books and Media, LTD's Motion for Dismissal (Dkt. #8 ) filed on July 26, 2021. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/10/2021. (AKH)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Defendant BEACON BOOKS AND MEDIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AKH)
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Defendant MAUDE MURRAY. (AKH)
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Extend the Time to Respond, filed by Plaintiffs MICHAEL FITZGERALD, WORLD WISDOM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike)(Rauch, Jason)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiffs MICHAEL FITZGERALD, WORLD WISDOM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jason M. Rauch ISO Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jason M. Rauch (USPS Tracking), #3 Exhibit B - 2021-07-13 - Beacon Books Statement with exhibits, #4 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Beacon Default)(Perry, Louis)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Charles on behalf of Plaintiffs MICHAEL FITZGERALD, WORLD WISDOM, INC.. (Charles, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 Statement by MAUDE MURRAY. (AKH)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 **STRICKEN AT DKT. #15 .** MOTION for Dismissal, filed by Defendant BEACON BOOKS AND MEDIA, LTD. (AKH) Modified on 8/10/2021 (AKH).
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BEACON BOOKS AND MEDIA, LTD, MAUDE MURRAY. (LMK) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/21/2021) (LMK).
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Supplement Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Ex. A - 1995 Settlement Agreement and Order, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - 2003 Copyright and rights of Publicity Assignment, #5 Exhibit Ex. C - 2021 Assignment of Interest in Settlement Agreement, #6 Ex. D - 2021 Copyright and Rights of Publicity Assignment, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons to Maude Murray, Beacon Books) (AKH)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Rauch on behalf of Plaintiffs MICHAEL FITZGERALD, WORLD WISDOM, INC.. (Rauch, Jason)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis T. Perry on behalf of Plaintiffs MICHAEL FITZGERALD, WORLD WISDOM, INC.. (Perry, Louis)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MICHAEL FITZGERALD, WORLD WISDOM, INC.. (Rauch, Jason)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6618261) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - 1995 Settlement Agreement and Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - 2003 Copyright and rights of Publicity Assignment, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - 2021 Assignment of Interest in Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - 2021 Copyright and Rights of Publicity Assignment, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Maude Murray, Beacon Books)(Rauch, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FITZGERALD et al v. MURRAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEACON BOOKS AND MEDIA, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAUDE MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WORLD WISDOM, INC.
Represented By: Jason Rauch
Represented By: Louis T. Perry
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FITZGERALD
Represented By: Jason Rauch
Represented By: Louis T. Perry
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?