AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Plaintiff: AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND CO. and ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv01922
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Judgment) (JRB)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that final judgment of non infringement is hereby entered in favor of Amphastar and against Lilly as to Amphastar's claim for declaration of noninfringement of the '334 patent with respect to Amphastar's ANDA Product as described in the Amphastar ANDA, as set forth in Count I of Amphastar's Complaint (D.I. 1). SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/1/2021.(AAS) Modified on 10/4/2021 (JRB).
September 30, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Enter Consent Judgment, filed by Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendant's #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File answer or otherwise respond to complaint to 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/30/2021. (SWM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to October 1, 2021 , filed by Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (RAGS) (JRB)
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension, filed by Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
September 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Pollack-Milgate on behalf of Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Alissa K. Lipton/Eli LIlly and Company on 08/31/2021, filed by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service)(Craig, Darren)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney John T. Bennett for AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC. added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, John T. Bennett is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to John T. Bennett via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/19/2021. (SWM)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (JRB)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 Submission of Proposed Order , re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) John T. Bennett to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6634384), filed by Plaintiff AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Craig, Darren)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) John T. Bennett to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6634384), filed by Plaintiff AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Pro Hac Certification)(Craig, Darren)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 Submission of Proposed Order , re #5 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #4 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Craig, Darren)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #4 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Craig, Darren)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #4 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Craig, Darren)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED , re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit D Device Related Information, #3 Exhibit E Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA 213641) Module 1, #4 Exhibit F Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA 213641) Module 3)(Craig, Darren)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Craig, Darren)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Andrew Craig on behalf of Plaintiff AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Craig, Darren)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against ELI LILLY AND CO., filed by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6634329) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A '334 Patent, #2 Exhibit B Paragraph IV Patent Certifications, #3 Exhibit C Investor Presentation, #4 Exhibit D Device Related Information, #5 Exhibit E Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA 213641) Module 1, #6 Exhibit F Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA 213641) Module 3, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Craig, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Darren Andrew Craig
Represented By: John T. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Represented By: Deborah Pollack-Milgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?