WEAVER v. ZATECKY et al
Plaintiff: DONALD E. WEAVER, JR.
Defendant: DUSHAN ZATECKY, DENNIS REAGLE, SHERI WILSON, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC., DUANE ALSIP and PAUL A. TALBOT
Case Number: 1:2021cv02455
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DONALD E. WEAVER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(AKH)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Denying #3 Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel - On September 17, 2021, Donald Weaver this civil rights lawsuit against officials at Pendleton Correctional Facility. That same day, Mr. Weaver also filed a motion for assistance with recruiting counsel. Mr. Weaver's motion for assistance with recruiting counsel, dkt. #3 , is DENIED without prejudice. (See Order). Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/21/2021. (AKH)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through November 12, 2021, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by DONALD E. WEAVER, JR. (AKH)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Assistance with Recruited Counsel, filed by Plaintiff DONALD E. WEAVER, JR. (REO)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DONALD E. WEAVER, JR. (REO)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUANE ALSIP, DENNIS REAGLE, PAUL A. TALBOT, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC., SHERI WILSON, DUSHAN ZATECKY, filed by DONALD E. WEAVER, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEAVER v. ZATECKY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD E. WEAVER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUSHAN ZATECKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS REAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERI WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUANE ALSIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL A. TALBOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?