WORKMAN et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: RYAN WORKMAN, TIA WORKMAN, Ryker W Workman, Colin W Workman, R. W. and C. W.
Defendant: United States and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv02589
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Maintain Docket No. 1 Under Seal Dkt. #5 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to PERMENANTLY SEAL Docket No. 1 and note at Docket No. 1 that the redacted version can be found at Docket No. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/29/2021. (CKM)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 10/22/2021. (Foley, Edmond)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Foley, Edmond)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 REDACTION to #1 Complaint by C. W., R. W., RYAN WORKMAN, TIA WORKMAN. (Foley, Edmond)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document or to Maintain a Document Under Seal #1 , filed by Plaintiffs C. W., R. W., RYAN WORKMAN, TIA WORKMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foley, Edmond) Modified on 10/8/2021 (CKM).
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (LMK)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmond W. Foley on behalf of Plaintiffs RYAN WORKMAN, TIA WORKMAN, Colin W Workman, Ryker W Workman. (Foley, Edmond)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6781745) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foley, Edmond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WORKMAN et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN WORKMAN
Represented By: Edmond W. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIA WORKMAN
Represented By: Edmond W. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryker W Workman
Represented By: Edmond W. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin W Workman
Represented By: Edmond W. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. W.
Represented By: Edmond W. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. W.
Represented By: Edmond W. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?