UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC., TODDRICK FAIRLEY, KARANA WALLACE, TIMOTHY FAGLEY, IRA BROCKMAN, ESTATE OF, RUTH BROCKMAN, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, NEIHOFF TRUCKING, INC., AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MIDWEST INSURANCE ALLIANCE, LLC, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, EQUIAN, LLC, HIGHMARK, INC., KIMBERLY FAGLEY, DENISE BROCKMAN KISER and PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02592
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 42 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint For Interpleader, filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Moyer, Kevin)
December 2, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. NEIHOFF TRUCKING, INC. waiver sent on 11/16/2021. (Mackowski, Paul)
December 2, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 11/16/2021. (Mackowski, Paul)
December 2, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. TODDRICK FAIRLEY waiver sent on 11/16/2021. (Mackowski, Paul)
December 1, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Keske, Roland)
November 30, 2021 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal , as to Defendant EQUIAN, LLC, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mackowski, Paul)
November 29, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 11/16/2021. (Mackowski, Paul)
November 22, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland Scott Keske, I on behalf of Defendant AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Keske, Roland)
November 22, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time to 12/30/2021 To Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Interpleader, filed by Defendant THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Daniels, Michael) Modified on 11/23/2021 - not a Motion(DWH).
November 22, 2021 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent CINCINNATI FINANCIAL CORPORATION for THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Daniels, Michael)
November 18, 2021 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIGHMARK, INC.. (Clare, Linda)
November 18, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda H. Clare on behalf of Defendant HIGHMARK, INC.. (Clare, Linda)
November 15, 2021 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to RUTH BROCKMAN, DENISE BROCKMAN KISER, CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, EQUIAN, LLC, KIMBERLY FAGLEY, TIMOTHY FAGLEY, TODDRICK FAIRLEY, HIGHMARK, INC., LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC., NEIHOFF TRUCKING, INC., PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, KARANA WALLACE. (MAC)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2022 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/11/2021.(SWM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Klausing, Joseph)
November 10, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Klausing on behalf of Defendant CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Klausing, Joseph)
November 10, 2021 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Interpleader against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, RUTH BROCKMAN, DENISE BROCKMAN KISER, CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, EQUIAN, LLC, KIMBERLY FAGLEY, TIMOTHY FAGLEY, TODDRICK FAIRLEY, HIGHMARK, INC., LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC., MIDWEST INSURANCE ALLIANCE, LLC, NEIHOFF TRUCKING, INC., PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, KARANA WALLACE, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Sherman, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 25 RETURN of Service, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 10/15/2021. (Sherman, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 24 RETURN of Service, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY served on 10/15/2021. (Sherman, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 23 RETURN of Service, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY served on 10/18/2021. (Sherman, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. KARANA WALLACE waiver sent on 11/10/2021. (Sherman, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, all exhibits, and requests for issuance of summons of additional Defendant Praetorian Insurance Company within the next seven (7) days of this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-caption the case to list Praetorian Insurance Company as a named defendant. The Defendant Midwest Insurance Alliance, LLC is hereby dismissed from the litigation, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/5/2021. (CBU)
November 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Daniels on behalf of Defendant THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Daniels, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L. Moyer on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bozidar Robert Ostojic on behalf of Defendant AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Ostojic, Bozidar)
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendants TODDRICK FAIRLEY, LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC. (Foos, Robert)
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendants TODDRICK FAIRLEY, LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 Submission of Proposed Order , re #11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Interpleader, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mackowski, Paul)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, RUTH BROCKMAN, DENISE BROCKMAN KISER, CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, EQUIAN, LLC, KIMBERLY FAGLEY, TIMOTHY FAGLEY, TODDRICK FAIRLEY, HIGHMARK, INC., LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC., MIDWEST INSURANCE ALLIANCE, LLC, NEIHOFF TRUCKING, INC., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, KARANA WALLACE. (Mackowski, Paul)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Interpleader, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint for Interpleader)(Mackowski, Paul)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Court's Registry, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registry Deposit Information Form, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mackowski, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons (Alias - Amended) as to TODDRICK FAIRLEY. (DWH)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to TODDRICK FAIRLEY. (Mackowski, Paul) Modified on 10/12/2021 (DWH).
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vo Sherman on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Sherman, Michael)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, RUTH BROCKMAN, DENISE BROCKMAN KISER, CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, EQUIAN, LLC, KIMBERLY FAGLEY, TIMOTHY FAGLEY, TODDRICK FAIRLEY, HIGHMARK, INC., LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC., MIDWEST INSURANCE ALLIANCE, LLC, NEIHOFF TRUCKING, INC., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, KARANA WALLACE. (LMK)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mackowski, Paul)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Mackowski on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mackowski, Paul)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, RUTH BROCKMAN, IRA BROCKMAN, ESTATE OF, CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, EQUIAN, LLC, KIMBERLY FAGLEY, TIMOTHY FAGLEY, TODDRICK FAIRLEY, HIGHMARK, INC., LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC., MIDWEST INSURANCE ALLIANCE, LLC, NEIHOFF TRUCKING, INC., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, KARANA WALLACE, filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6782222) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Mackowski, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Paul D. Mackowski
Represented By: Michael Vo Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTI TRUCKING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODDRICK FAIRLEY
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARANA WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY FAGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRA BROCKMAN, ESTATE OF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTH BROCKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kevin L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIHOFF TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Bozidar Robert Ostojic
Represented By: Roland Scott Keske, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEARPATH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Joseph C. Klausing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST INSURANCE ALLIANCE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael S. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHMARK, INC.
Represented By: Linda H. Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY FAGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE BROCKMAN KISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?