BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY and BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND
Defendant: HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C. and K H HERMESCH LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02655
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for a TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on JANUARY 12, 2022 at 11:30 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/19/2021.(AAS)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara K.C.S.M. Herlitz on behalf of Defendants HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C., K H HERMESCH LLC. (Herlitz, Tara)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Automatic Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C., K H HERMESCH LLC (Gifford, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C., K H HERMESCH LLC. (RAGS) (JRB)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Gifford on behalf of Defendants HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C., K H HERMESCH LLC. (Gifford, Justin)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND. K H HERMESCH LLC served on 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND. HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C. served on 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C., and K H HERMESCH LLC. (JRB)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY. (Schwartz, Donald)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C., K H HERMESCH LLC, filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6793630) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERMESCH MASONRY L.L.C.
Represented By: Justin M. Gifford
Represented By: Tara K.C.S.M. Herlitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K H HERMESCH LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Gifford
Represented By: Tara K.C.S.M. Herlitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?