MARK MCCLESKEY et al v. EASON CONSTRUCTION LLC
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS and MARK MCCLESKEY
Defendant: EASON CONSTRUCTION LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02676
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EASON CONSTRUCTION LLC. Signed by Clerk, Roger A.G. Sharpe. Pursuant to the application for entry of default, default is hereby entered, on this 10th day of December, 2021 against Defendant for failure to plead or otherwise defend this action. (CKM)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Donald)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. EASON CONSTRUCTION LLC served on 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EASON CONSTRUCTION LLC. (LMK)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EASON CONSTRUCTION LLC, filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6797671) (Attachments: #1 A - Memorandum of Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARK MCCLESKEY et al v. EASON CONSTRUCTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASON CONSTRUCTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?