STATE OF INDIANA EX REL ROKITA v. NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA EX REL ROKITA
Defendant: NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02748
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David E Jose on behalf of Defendant NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC. (Jose, David)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC for NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC.. (Overholt, Suzannah)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by All Defendants.(Overholt, Suzannah)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzannah Wilson Overholt on behalf of Defendant NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC. (Overholt, Suzannah)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by STATE OF INDIANA EX REL ROKITA. NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2021. (Yeoman, Joseph)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Yeoman on behalf of Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA EX REL ROKITA. (Yeoman, Joseph)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC, filed by STATE OF INDIANA EX REL ROKITA. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6814611) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Yeoman, Joseph)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S. Swetnam on behalf of Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA EX REL ROKITA. (Swetnam, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF INDIANA EX REL ROKITA v. NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA EX REL ROKITA
Represented By: Douglas S. Swetnam
Represented By: Joseph D. Yeoman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHSIDE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: David E Jose
Represented By: Suzannah Wilson Overholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?