PERRY v. COCHRAN et al
Plaintiff: RODNEY S. PERRY, SR.
Defendant: RYAN COCHRAN, Q. RUIZ, DENNIS REAGLE, DUANE ALSIP, D. DAVIS, JIM BOLDMAN, MICHAEL PLFEEGER and DON WILLIAMS
Case Number: 1:2021cv02753
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Rodney S. Perry - The plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis was granted. No initial partial filing fee was assessed. However, plaintiff is still obligated to pay the full three hundred and fifty dollars ($350.00) filing fee. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Warden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/21/22.(JRB)
December 16, 2021 Filing 33 Submission of Letter to Warndy and Rains, filed by Plaintiff RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (CKM)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - ENTRY GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; On December 2, 2021, the Court granted Rodney Perry's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and ordered him to pay an initial partial filing fee of $114.53. Dkt. 10. Mr. Perry's second motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. 23, demonstrates that he has not had the means to make that payment since the Court assessed it. Mr. Perry's motion, dkt. #23 , is granted in part and denied in part. To the extent Mr. Perry again requests to proceed in forma pauperis, the motion is denied as unnecessary. To the extent he asks the Court to vacate its assessment of an initial partial filing fee, the motion is granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4) ("In no event shall a prisoner be prohibited from bringing a civil action... for the reason that the prisoner has no assets and no means by which to pay the initial partial filing fee."). The Court will issue a separate order to arrange collection of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/16/2021. (CKM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Deontre Smoots by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit b,c,d) (CKM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Jwain Poindexter by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit b,c,d) (CKM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Robert Preacher by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit b,c,d) (CKM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Willie Pargo by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit b,c,d & f) (CKM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Raymond Mills by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit b,c,d & f) (CKM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Christopher Lockett by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope b,c,d) (CKM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Reese Keith by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit b,c,d)(CKM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 24 DECLARATION of John Smith by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits B, C,D) (CKM)
December 9, 2021 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Resident Activity Report)(CKM) Modified on 12/14/2021 (CKM).
December 3, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Willie Pargo by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10) (CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Rodney Perry by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit c1 - c2, #2 Exhibit a - b1 - d1 -d10) (CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Robert Preacher by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10)(CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Reese Keith by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10) (CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Raymond Mims by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10) (CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Raymond Crabtree Jr. by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10) (CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jwain Poindexter by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10)(CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of John Smith by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10) (CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Deontre Smoots by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10) (CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Christopher Lockett by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d1-d10) (CKM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Aaron J. Smith by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits d1-d10) (CKM) Modified on 12/14/2021 (CKM).
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits). (MAC)
December 2, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY - ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; Rodney Perry's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is granted to the extent that he is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $114.53. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Mr. Perry will have through January 3, 2022, to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/2/2021. cc:fin (CKM)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 Submission of Proposed Subpoenas, filed by Plaintiff RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (CKM)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 Submission of Proposed Subpoenas, filed by Plaintiff RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (CKM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Submission of Subpoenas, filed by Plaintiff RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (CKM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Tort Claim, filed by Plaintiff RODNEY S. PERRY, SR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B & C) (CKM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (TMC)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification Of Inmate Trust Fund Account)(LMK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DUANE ALSIP, JIM BOLDMAN, RYAN COCHRAN, D. DAVIS, MICHAEL PLFEEGER, DENNIS REAGLE, Q. RUIZ, DON WILLIAMS, filed by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Exhibit)(LMK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR located at PENDLETON CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by RODNEY S. PERRY, SR to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (LMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERRY v. COCHRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY S. PERRY, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN COCHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q. RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS REAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUANE ALSIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM BOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PLFEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?