MCCLESKEY et al v. SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS and MARK MCCLESKEY
Defendant: SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY and SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02770
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY, SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC.(Siepman, Kenneth)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 3:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the deadlines set forth. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/2/2021. (GD) Modified on 12/16/2021 (to correct date & time per Scheduling Order) (GD).
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY, SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC. (Siepman, Kenneth)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC. (Siepman, Kenneth)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY. (Siepman, Kenneth)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Elise Ehlermann on behalf of Defendants SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY, SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC. (Ehlermann, Rachel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Siepman on behalf of Defendants SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY, SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC. (Siepman, Kenneth)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY served on 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC served on 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY, SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC. (REO)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY, SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC, filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6819399) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLESKEY et al v. SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHILLI PLASTERING COMPANY
Represented By: Kenneth B. Siepman
Represented By: Rachel Elise Ehlermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNCOAST POOL FINISHES, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth B. Siepman
Represented By: Rachel Elise Ehlermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?