MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE et al v. WICK CONCRETE, INC.
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE and INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Defendant: WICK CONCRETE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02779
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 CLOSED DISMISSED - MARGINAL ENTRY regarding #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. ACKNOWLEDGED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/12/2021.(AKH)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WICK CONCRETE, INC. (NLR)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WICK CONCRETE, INC., filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6820757) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE et al v. WICK CONCRETE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WICK CONCRETE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?