PAYTON et al v. WALSH et al
Plaintiff: JULIA REAGAN, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, STEPHANIE PAYTON, ROBIN BURNS, RACHEL WEGNER, SANDY SWARTZ, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, CASEY DELCOCO, STEPHANIE WEAVER, SARAH ROTTLER, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, KAREN ROGERS, CIRITA WATSON, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, JEFF SHAW and BARBARA TRAPP
Defendant: MARTIN J. WALSH and ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2021cv02817
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mario Garcia
2 Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Peters, David)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STATUS REPORT by ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Pryor, Patricia)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: While Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction was pending, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint status update on whether Ascension had ended the suspensions of any named Plaintiffs, allowing them to return to their positions. Dkt. 54. In response, the parties filed several status updates, dkts. 55, 56 and 58 (Plaintiffs' Updates) and dkt. 57 (Defendants' Update). Plaintiffs asked the Court to defer any ruling for seven days so that Plaintiffs' counsel could "contact with and speak with all the Plaintiffs to confirm their status." Dkt. 55. The parties' filings inform the Court that Plaintiffs Payton, Huber, Burns, Wegner, Swartz, Weaver, Rogers, Watson, Mackenzie, Shaw and Trapp have been notified that they were no longer suspended but were offered reinstatement to their respective positions, and that Plaintiff Frederick resigned. Dkts. 55; 57. Plaintiffs informed the Court that, as of December 28, 2021, Ascension had not allowed Dr. Delcoco to return to caring for patients at hospitals within its network. Dkt. 56. The parties' filings have not reported whether Plaintiffs Reagan and Rottler have had their suspensions lifted or whether they will be permanently terminated effective today, January 4, 2022. The parties are ordered to update the Court on the employment status for each of these three final Plaintiffs seeking injunctive relief, including whether they have obtained alternative employment or been offered to return to their previous roles, by 10:00 a.m. on January 5, 2022. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/4/2022. (PKP)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STATUS REPORT 2nd Supplemental by All Plaintiffs. (Peters, David)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Defendant's Status Report by ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (Pryor, Patricia)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE Updated Status Report: Dr. Delcoco, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER, re #55 Notice (Other). (Peters, David)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE Of Joint Status Report, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER (Peters, David)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - On December 27, 2021, the Court was informed by Plaintiffs in related case Halczenko v. Ascension Health Inc., No. 1:21-cv-2816-JPH-MG, that Ascension had ended the suspensions of certain named Plaintiffs and informed them that they may return to their positions. Dkt. 48. The Court ORDERS the parties in this matter to file a joint status update by 12:00 p.m. (noon) EST on December 28, 2021 advising the Court which, if any, of the Plaintiffs have been notified that their suspensions have ended and they may return to their positions. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/27/2021. (DWH)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY in Support of Motion re #46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (Pryor, Patricia)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (McReynolds, Matthew)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY in Support of Motion re #38 First MOTION for Permanent Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (McReynolds, Matthew)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Matthew McReynolds added as counsel for the Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 12/9/2021. (CBU)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew B. McReynolds to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6877830), filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (McReynolds, Matthew)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 First MOTION for Permanent Injunction , filed by Defendant ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Delcoco Findings of Fact Law Opposition to PI St. Vincent, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Laura Atkinson Opposition to PI St. Vincent, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bridges Order Opposition to PI St. Vincent, #4 Exhibit 4 - Creger Memo Opposition to PI St. Vincent)(McDermott, Brian)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (McDermott, Brian)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDermott, Brian)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL identifying Corporate Parent ST. VINCENT HEALTH, INC., Corporate Parent Ascension Health, Inc. for ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL.. (McDermott, Brian)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia: Status Conference held on 11/17/2021. Parties appeared by counsel for a Status Conference by telephone. Plaintiff intends to file for a preliminary injunction in this case regarding their Title VII claims. Motion for Preliminary Injunction and brief due by November 19, 2021. Defendant's opposition and brief due by December 3, 2021. Plaintiff's reply due December 10, 2021. Plaintiff does not intend to ask for a hearing, and the Court will decide the matter on the merits of the parties' briefs and record. No discovery on the Preliminary Injunction issue is needed by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. (NAD)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Submission of Signature Requirement re #39 Brief/Memorandum in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peters, David)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Submission of Signature Requirement re #38 First MOTION for Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Peters, David)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Summons Issued as to MARTIN J. WALSH. (DWH)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to All Plaintiffs. (Peters, David)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 First MOTION for Permanent Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peters, David)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 First MOTION for Permanent Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Peters, David) Modified text on 11/22/2021 (DWH).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on Wednesday, November 17, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia to discuss an expedited case management plan and discovery schedule as instructed by this Court's Order at Dkt. #19 entered in case number 1:21-cv-02816-JPH-MG. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/15/2021.(NAD)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Address of Principle: ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (DWH)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-02817-JPH-MG, on all future filings in this matter. (LMK)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Resident Agent for Defendant ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (MAC)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:21-cv-02816. Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/15/2021. (AKW)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in Civil Action, Verified Complaint for Declaratory Relief, Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, Emergency Motion and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Evidentiary Hearing on Imposition of a Preliminary Injunction, Brief in Support of Emergency Motion and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Evidentiary Hearing on Imposition of a Preliminary Injunction, Verification of Complaint Under Oath served on Stuart Settle on 11/9/2021, filed by ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (AKH)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(AKH)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James Patrick Hanlon and Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Judge Sarah Evans Barker, Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-02817-JPH-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (LMK)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge James P. Hanlon and Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:21-cv-02816-JPH-DML. Judge Sarah Evans Barker and Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/12/2021. (LDH)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - denying #19 and #21 Motion for TRO; On this date, Plaintiffs appeared telephonically by counsel, David Peters, and Defendant Ascension St. Vincent Hospital appeared telephonically by counsel, Brian L. McDermott and Patricia Anderson, for a conference regarding Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, filed on November 11, 2021. As stated on the record, Plaintiffs' counsel informed the Court that Plaintiffs' request for a TRO is limited to their Title VII claim and that they filed this lawsuit before exhausting the EEOC process. Plaintiffs have not yet achieved service on the government. Because Plaintiffs' TRO request is limited to the Title VII claim and a remedy under Title VII provides monetary damages, Plaintiffs are unable to establish irreparable harm or that there is no adequate remedy at law. The Court therefore denied the motion. This cause will be reassigned to our colleague, the Honorable James Patrick Hanlon, as a related case to No. 1:21-cv-02816-JPH-DML. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/12/2021. (CKM)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute Entry for Telephonic Conference held before Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/12/2021. The parties appeared telephonically by counsel. The parties discussed the Plaintiff's Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Dkt. 21]. The Court denied the motion for the reasons stated by the Court at the conclusion of the lawyers' presentations. This action will be reassigned to the Honorable James Patrick Hanlon due to related case No. 1:21-cv-02816-JPH-DML. There being no further issues raised by the Court or by parties, the conference was adjourned. (Court Reporter David Moxley.) (LDH)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/11/2021.(LDH)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Counsel (SUPPLEMENTAL) ON EFFORTS TO CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL by David Peters on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Peters, David)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to All Plaintiffs. (Peters, David)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Second MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peters, David)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Peters, David)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Peters, David)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to All Plaintiffs. (Peters, David)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER (Peters, David)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Peters on behalf of Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Peters, David)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (Pryor, Patricia)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Ann Van Pelt on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (Van Pelt, Megan)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. McDermott on behalf of Defendant ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL. (McDermott, Brian)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by David C. Peters, II on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/10/2021. (LDH)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of related action, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER (Bohnet, Eric)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of compliance with order of November 10, 2021, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Certification of Efforts Undertaken to Provide Notice to the Adverse Party) (Bohnet, Eric)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Bohnet, Eric)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - On November 10, 2021, Mr. Eric C. Bohnet submitted for filing a document captioned Certificate of Counsel of Service purportedly on behalf of Plaintiffs in this lawsuit. The document Mr. Bohnet sought to docket is a copy of a letter to the Court signed by Plaintiffs' counsel, "Dr. Dave Peters, J.D., M.S., PhD." Mr. Bohnet has not entered an appearance in this action. Pursuant to S.D. Ind. Local Rule 83-7, "[e]very attorney who represents a party or who files a document on a party's behalf must first file an appearance for that party...". In addition, the document is not a "pleading, motion, brief, affidavit, notice, or proposed order." (S.D. Ind. L.R. 5-1(a)). Therefore, the entry identified as Dkt. 7 is hereby STRICKEN pursuant to S.D. Ind. L.R. 1-3. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/10/2021. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *** STRICKEN PER ORDER #8 *** CERTIFICATE of Counsel of service by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit of service) (Bohnet, Eric) Modified on 11/10/2021 (CKM).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - denying #3 Motion for TRO and Motion for Emergency Hearing. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/10/2021. Copy Mailed. *** SEE ORDER *** (CKM)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered a summons that is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(C), which requires a summons to state the name and address of the attorney of plaintiff... Plaintiff has tendered a summons without the contact information for counsel. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit properly completed summons for issuance. (LDH)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Emergency Hearing, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, and RACHEL WEGNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Emergency Hearing, filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, and RACHEL WEGNER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Emergency Motion and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Envelope)(DJH)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) David C. Peters II to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number IP076674) filed by Plaintiffs ROBIN BURNS, CASEY DELCOCO, KIRSTA EVANS, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, JOSHUA FREDERICK, JACQUELINE HUBER, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, STEPHANIE PAYTON, JULIA REAGAN, KAREN ROGERS, SARAH ROTTLER, JEFF SHAW, SANDY SWARTZ, BARBARA TRAPP, CIRITA WATSON, STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(DJH)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL, MARTIN J. WALSH, filed by STEPHANIE WEAVER, RACHEL WEGNER, JULIA REAGAN, SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE, STEPHANIE PAYTON(RN), JEFF SHAW, CIRITA WATSON, KIRSTA EVANS, ROBIN BURNS, JOSHUA FREDERICK, CRYSTAL MCCARDLE, SARAH ROTTLER, ABIGAIL FLEENOR, KAREN ROGERS, SANDY SWARTZ, JACQUELINE HUBER, CASEY DELCOCO, BARBARA TRAPP. (Filing fee $402, Receipt Number IP076674) (Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Sarah MacKenzie, #2 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Crystal McCardle, #3 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Stephanie Weaver, #4 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Barbara Trapp, #5 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Abigail Fleenor, #6 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Stephanie Payton, #7 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Joshua Frederick, #8 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Jacqueline Huber, #9 Verification of Complaint Under Oath by Sandy Swartz, #10 Proposed Summons to Defendants, #11 Cover Letter, #12 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAYTON et al v. WALSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA REAGAN
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA FREDERICK
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE HUBER
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE PAYTON
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN BURNS
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL WEGNER
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDY SWARTZ
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL MCCARDLE
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY DELCOCO
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE WEAVER
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH ROTTLER
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRSTA EVANS
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABIGAIL FLEENOR
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN ROGERS
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIRITA WATSON
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH BLYSTRA MACKENZIE
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF SHAW
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA TRAPP
Represented By: David C. Peters, II
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Represented By: Matthew McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN J. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCENSION ST. VINCENT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Brian L. McDermott
Represented By: Megan Ann Van Pelt
Represented By: Patricia Anderson Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?