SPARGER-WITHERS v. TAYLOR et al
Plaintiff: AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS
Defendant: JOSHUA N. TAYLOR, BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY and WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02824
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to February 4, 2022 re #6 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, JOSHUA N. TAYLOR, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Thomas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 47 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, JOSHUA N. TAYLOR, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Fisher, Thomas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, JOSHUA N. TAYLOR, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Probable Cause Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Information, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Finding Probably Cause, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order Dismissing Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order Granting Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc Entry, #9 Exhibit 9 - Casey Declaration)(Fisher, Thomas)
December 28, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Rebecca Holmes on behalf of Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Holmes, Melinda)
December 28, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Catherine Payne on behalf of Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Payne, Julia)
December 28, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Fisher on behalf of Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Fisher, Thomas)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline to respond to the Motion for Class Certification is extended to January 7, 2022. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/13/2021. (DWH)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline to respond to the motion for class certification is extended to January 7, 2022. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/13/2021. (DWH)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 11:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 12/13/2021.(CBU)
December 10, 2021 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 01/07/2022 re #6 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Defendant JOSHUA N. TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, William)
December 10, 2021 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 01/07/2022 re #6 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garn, Jefferson)
December 10, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re, filed by Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Garn, Jefferson)
December 10, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson S. Garn on behalf of Defendants BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (Garn, Jefferson)
December 2, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant JOSHUA N. TAYLOR (Riley, William) Modified on 12/3/2021 (JDC).
December 2, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Riley on behalf of Defendant JOSHUA N. TAYLOR. (Riley, William)
December 2, 2021 Filing 33 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. JOSHUA N. TAYLOR served on 11/15/2021. (Sanders, Anthony)
December 2, 2021 Filing 32 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Wabash County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 2, 2021 Filing 31 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Starke County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 30 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Shelby County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 29 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Rush County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 28 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Morgan County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 27 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Miami County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 26 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Marshall County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 25 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Henry County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 24 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Harrison County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 23 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Hancock County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 22 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Grant County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 21 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Fulton County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Fayette County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 19 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Decatur County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Dearborn and Ohio County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
December 1, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of Service, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY served on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Blackford County Prosecuting Attorney)(Sanders, Anthony)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Robert M. Belden for AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS added. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-6,Amended 11/8/2021, counselseeking Pro Hac Admissionneed to seek access to theCourts Electronic Case FilingSystem via PACER.GOV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/17/2021 Copy sent to Attorney Belden via US Mail (CBU)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael N. Greensburg for AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS added. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-6,Amended 11/8/2021, counsel seeking Pro Hac Admissionneed to seek access to the Courts Electronic Case Filing System via PACER.GOV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/17/2021 Copy sent to Attorney Greenburg via US Mail (CBU)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Samuel B. Gedge for AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS added. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-6, Amended 11/8/2021, counsel seeking Pro Hac Admission need to seek access to the Courts Electronic Case Filing System via PACER.GOV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/17/2021 Copy sent to Mr. Gedge via US Mail (CBU)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert M. Belden to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6838643), filed by Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Robert M. Belden in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order - Belden Pro Hac Vice)(Sanders, Anthony)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael N. Greenberg to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6838310), filed by Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Michael N. Greenberg in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order - Greenberg Pro Hac Vice)(Sanders, Anthony)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel B. Gedge to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6837993), filed by Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Samuel B. Gedge in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order - Gedge Pro Hac Vice)(Sanders, Anthony)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY, JOSHUA N. TAYLOR, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY. (REO)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Sanders, Anthony)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel B. Gedge in Support of Class-Certification Motion, #2 Declaration of Michael N. Greenberg in Support of Class-Certification Motion, #3 Index to Greenberg Declaration Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1 to Greenberg Declaration - 2021 forfeiture complaints, #5 Exhibit 2 to Greenberg Declaration - 2021 racketeer-forfeiture complaints, #6 Exhibit 3 to Greenberg Declaration - 2020 forfeiture complaints, #7 Exhibit 4 to Greenberg Declaration - 2020 racketeer-forfeiture complaints, #8 Exhibit 5 to Greenberg Declaration - 2019 forfeiture complaints, #9 Exhibit 6 to Greenberg Declaration - 2019 racketeer-forfeiture complaints, #10 Exhibit 7 to Greenberg Declaration - Active forfeiture complaints, #11 Exhibit 8 to Greenberg Declaration - Active racketeer-forfeiture complaints, #12 Exhibit 9 to Greenberg Declaration - Forfeiture complaint against Amya Sparger-Withers, #13 Exhibit 10 to Greenberg Declaration - Amended forfeiture complaint against Amya Sparger-Withers)(Sanders, Anthony)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Aaron Milkey on behalf of Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Milkey, Scott)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia A. Bedrick on behalf of Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Bedrick, Cynthia)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lee McNeely on behalf of Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (McNeely, J.)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony B. Sanders on behalf of Plaintiff AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Sanders, Anthony)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6834756) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Contract Between Joshua N. Taylor and the Hancock County Prosecuting Attorney, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPARGER-WITHERS v. TAYLOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMYA SPARGER-WITHERS
Represented By: Cynthia A. Bedrick
Represented By: J. Lee McNeely
Represented By: Scott Aaron Milkey
Represented By: Anthony B. Sanders
Represented By: Michael N. Greensburg
Represented By: Robert M. Belden
Represented By: Samuel B. Gedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA N. TAYLOR
Represented By: William N. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEARBORN AND OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Melinda Rebecca Holmes
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?